Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Juan R Sanchez
Case #: 2:24-cv-02447
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
EVAN LOUIS FRANK
Alan L. Frank Law Associates, Pc.
contact info
Plaintiff
TARA KELLY
Represented By
CAREN N. GURMANKIN
Console Mattiacci Law LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2024
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/11/24. 12/11/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Dec 11 2024
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/11/24. 12/11/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/24 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS IN THE 8/11/25 TRIAL POOL. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 8/6/25 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 14B. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 8/4/25. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 7/28/25. A TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 7/22/25 AT 11:00 A.M.. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/1/25. DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 5/27/25; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/24/25. 2/24/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 5:25 PM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT LETTER REQUEST FOR ONE FINAL WEEK TO PROVIDE A SETTLEMENT STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT IS GRANTED. PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE AN UPDATE TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY FEBRUARY 20, 2025, INCLUDING WHETHER IT IS APPROPRIATE FOR THE COURT TO ENTER AN ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 41.1(B) OF THE LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE OF THIS COURT. ABSENT COMPELLING JUSTIFICATION, NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL TIME WILL BE ENTERTAINED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/13/25. 2/13/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT LETTER REQUEST FOR ONE ADDITIONAL WEEK TO PROVIDE A SETTLEMENT STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT IS GRANTED. PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE AN UPDATE TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY 2/13/25; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/7/25. 2/7/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 11:04 AM
ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IN THIS CASE IS CONTINUED PENDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED PARTIES ARE TO PROVIDE AN UPDATE TO THE COURT BY FEBRUARY 6, 2025 REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND WHETHER IT IS APPROPRIATE FOR THE COURT TO ENTER AN ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 41.1(B) OF THE LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE OF THIS COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/23/25. 1/23/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE OELTJEN on behalf of TARA KELLY with Certificate of Service(OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 01/07 10:39 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/23/25 AT 10:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/7/25. 1/7/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 12/26 2:33 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC.(FRANK, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 12/11 5:24 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/11/24. 12/11/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
9 9 7 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 12/11 5:21 PM
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/11/24. 12/11/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/11 3:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Failure to Promote Claim Because Plaintiff did not File a Charge filed by TARA KELLY.(GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/28 4:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Failure to Promote Claim Because Plaintiff did not File a Charge filed by REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC.Certificate of Service.(FRANK, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/19 10:41 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 4) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT SINCE PLAINTIFF FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/19/2024.8/19/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/16 3:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by TARA KELLY.(GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/05 5:09 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Failure to Promote Claim Because Plaintiff did not File a Charge filed by REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC..(FRANK, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/07 11:31 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TARA KELLY. REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 6/6/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/06 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/6/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 06/05 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against REGENCY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17518714.), filed by TARA KELLY.(GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]