Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00526
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 2:57 AM CST
Defendant
ALG Holdings Family, LLC
Represented By
Michael P Hutchens
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Charles Sean North
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Brett Kroh
Represented By
Michael P Hutchens
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Charles Sean North
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kroh Exploration, LLC
Represented By
Michael P Hutchens
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Charles Sean North
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy B. Yowell
Represented By
Michael P Hutchens
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Charles Sean North
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherri Rose
Represented By
Karen K Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 03/31 3:35 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties' Agreed Motion to Dismiss. ECF No.19 . IT IS ORDERED that all claims asserted or that could be asserted by any party in the above styled and numbered civil action are dismissed with prejudice with costs taxed against the party incurring same. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/31/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 03/31 2:15 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sherri Rose, Kroh Exploration, LLC, ALG Holdings Family, LLC, Jeremy B. Yowell, Brett Kroh (Fitzgerald, Karen) Modified filers on 3/31/2025 (jnp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 02/03 11:14 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate settlement papers no later than March 31, 2025. All existing deadlines are hereby STAYED pending the filing of appropriate settlement papers by the parties. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/3/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 01/31 11:43 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement filed by Sherri Rose. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/02 4:41 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' joint motion extend mediation deadline (ECF No.14 ). Noting that the request is jointly made, the Court finds good cause to GRANT an extension. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/31/2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/2/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 trial Designation of Experts Mon 11/25 4:48 PM
Designation of Experts by Kroh Exploration, LLC, ALG Holdings Family, LLC, Jeremy B. Yowell, Brett Kroh. (Hutchens, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/21 4:13 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time Mediation Deadline filed by Sherri Rose (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 trial Designation of Experts Mon 10/28 9:09 AM
Designation of Experts by Sherri Rose. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Ex 1--Karen Fitzgerald CV,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Ex 2--TELA Attorney Fee Yearbook
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/06 2:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning June 23, 2025. Counsel and the parties shall be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during this four-week period. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2024. Motions due by 2/24/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/30/2024. Discovery due by 1/24/2025. Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/6/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 07/29 4:14 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Sherri Rose. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 9 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 6:10 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/31/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/3/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/03 5:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by ALG Holdings Family, LLC, Brett Kroh, Kroh Exploration, LLC, Jeremy B. Yowell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Michael P Hutchens added to party ALG Holdings Family, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P Hutchens added to party Brett Kroh(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P Hutchens added to party Kroh Exploration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P Hutchens added to party Jeremy B. Yowell(pty:dft) (Hutchens, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Tue 06/18 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ALG Holdings Family, LLC ; served on 6/5/2024. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Tue 06/18 9:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kroh Exploration, LLC ; served on 6/6/2024. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Tue 06/18 9:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeremy B. Yowell ; served on 6/6/2024. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Tue 06/18 9:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brett Kroh ; served on 6/6/2024. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 06/05 3:16 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mmw)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Wed 06/05 3:13 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 3:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sherri Rose. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Sherri Rose. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14672163) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Supplement