Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 5:24-cv-05121
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 2:18 AM CST
Defendant
Sharon Brooks
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Clemmer
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
Betsy Harrell
Represented By
Robert Justin Eichmann
Harrington Miller Law Firm
contact info
Thomas N. Kieklak
Harrington Miller Law Firm
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Susan Keller Kendall
Harrington Miller Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
Terri Hollingsworth
Represented By
Dominique Danielle Lane
Pulaski County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
Becky Lewallen
Represented By
Brian R. Lester
Washington County, Arkansas
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
William Luther
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
James Harmon Smith, III
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
John Thurston
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Williams
Represented By
Graham C. Talley
Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Waylan Cooper
Legal
contact info
Byron L. Freeland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard
contact info
Plaintiff
Get Loud Arkansas
Represented By
Christopher D. Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Steven T. Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Julie Zuckerbrod
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amanda Gale Orcutt
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Peter Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trinity Blake Loper
Represented By
Christopher D. Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Steven T. Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Julie Zuckerbrod
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amanda Gale Orcutt
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Peter Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikki Pastor
Represented By
Christopher D. Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Steven T. Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Julie Zuckerbrod
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amanda Gale Orcutt
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Peter Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vote.org
Represented By
Christopher D. Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Steven T. Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Julie Zuckerbrod
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amanda Gale Orcutt
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info
Peter Shults
Shults Law Firm LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 09 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 39 Defendant Harrell's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 41 Defendant Hollingsworth's Motion to Dismiss; and GRANTING 46 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 9, 2024. (Brooks, Timothy)

Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
91 91 order Protective Order Thu 04/24 9:06 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 24, 2025. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
90 90 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Cole Jester on behalf of Cole Jester. (Jester, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
89 89 motion Protective Order Thu 04/17 1:43 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Get Loud Arkansas, Trinity Blake Loper, Nikki Pastor, Vote.org.(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B