California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:24-cv-00989
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Imperial, ECU003459
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 to 10
Defendant
MJG Network, LLC
Defendant
Manuel Palma
Defendant
SMA Medical, Inc.
Represented By
Samantha T. Haimo
Feigeles & Haimo LLP
contact info
Deborah J. Wilson
Smith Currie & Hancock LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sophia Noriega
Represented By
Mazen Khatib
Khatib Law, Apc
contact info

GPO Nov 25 2024
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Leave to Serve Process Outside 90-Day Period. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/25/24. (aas)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/27 2:27 PM
ORDER Vacating Pending Due Dates in Light of35 Settlement. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/27/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
36 36 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 1:15 PM
ORDER . In light of the Parties' Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No.35 ), the Court VACATES the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2025. The Court SETS a Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") for 6/20/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. The Court will circulate the call-in information closer to the SDC. The Court will vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss with the Court and separately e-mail a proposed order for dismissal to the district judge's efile address beforehand. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/24/2025. (no document attached) (rxa)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/24 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Sophia Noriega (Khatib, Mazen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/21 1:08 PM
ORDER Granting33 Joint Motion to Extend Individual Defendant Manual Palma's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Manual Palma answer due 3/24/2025. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/21/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/19 1:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 30 days by MJG Network, LLC, Manuel Palma. (Kozlowska, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
32 32 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/22 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher . The Court held a Status Conference on 1/22/2025. (Plaintiff Attorney Mazen Khatib). (Defendant SMA Medical, Inc. Attorney Samantha T. Haimo). (Defendants MJG Network, LLC and Manuel Palma Attorney Adrienne Leah Conrad, Claudia Kozlowska). (no document attached) (rxa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Leah Conrad on behalf of MJG Network, LLC, Manuel Palma (Conrad, Adrienne)Attorney Adrienne Leah Conrad added to party Manuel Palma(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Claudia Kozlowska by Claudia Kozlowska on behalf of MJG Network, LLC, Manuel Palma (Kozlowska, Claudia)Attorney Claudia Kozlowska added to party Manuel Palma(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 3) Mon 12/30 2:22 PM
ORDER Granting28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Process Outside 90-Day Period. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/30/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
28 28 misc Declaration Thu 12/26 1:39 PM
DECLARATION Motion for Further Leave to Serve Process Outside of 90-Day Period by Plaintiff Sophia Noriega.(Khatib, Mazen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Attorney Declaration
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/18 1:37 PM
ORDER Granting in Part Joint26 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/13/2025. Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Status Conference set for 1/22/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 12/18/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 12/17 12:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and other Pre-Trial Deadlines and Mandatory Settlement Conference by SMA Medical, Inc.. (Haimo, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/10 4:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MJG Network, LLC.(Kozlowska, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/04 12:20 PM
ORDER Granting23 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. MJG Network, LLC answer due 12/10/2024. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/4/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/02 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 15 Days (L.R. 12.1, 7.2) by MJG Network, LLC. (Kozlowska, Claudia)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Claudia Kozlowska by Claudia Kozlowska on behalf of MJG Network, LLC (Kozlowska, Claudia)Attorney Claudia Kozlowska added to party MJG Network, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Leah Conrad on behalf of MJG Network, LLC (Conrad, Adrienne)Attorney Adrienne Leah Conrad added to party MJG Network, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Mon 11/25 12:44 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's19 Motion for Leave to Serve Process Outside 90-Day Period. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/25/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
19 19 misc Declaration Tue 11/19 1:01 PM
DECLARATION Motion for Leave to Serve Process Outside of 90-Day Period by Plaintiff Sophia Noriega.(Khatib, Mazen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Tue 11/19 12:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet, First Amended Complaint; Notice of Removal served on Maria Guzzardo of MJG Network, LLC on 10/25/24, filed by Sophia Noriega. (Khatib, Mazen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/24 11:05 AM
Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/24/2024.(mef)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/23 8:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher . The Court held a Status Conference on 10/18/2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Mazen Khatib). (Defendant Attorney Samantha T. Haimo). (no document attached) (rxa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/16 8:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Status Conference set for 10/18/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 9/11/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/15/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/15 5:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher . The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference on 8/15/2024. Scheduling Order to issue separately. (Plaintiff Attorney Mazen Khatib). (Defendant Attorney Samantha T. Haimo). (no document attached) (rxa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
13 13 notice Joint Discovery Plan Thu 08/08 12:27 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Sophia Noriega (Khatib, Mazen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
12 12 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 07/24 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-0989-JLS-DEB.(no document attached) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
11 11 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 07/03 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24CV0989-L-DEB.(no document attached) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 06/21 2:59 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Samantha T. Haimo, re9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/18/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 11:37 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18932759.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Haimo, Samantha) (exs)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 9:57 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Haimo, Samantha) (QC Mailer sent regarding missing payment) (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 06/07 11:55 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/15/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 6/7/24.(aas) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 06/06 6:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMA Medical, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,, of Amended Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Wilson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Thu 06/06 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMA Medical, Inc. of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Wilson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 06/06 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMA Medical, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,, (Wilson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 4:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMA Medical, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axc1)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 06/05 4:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by MJG Network, LLC, Manuel Palma, SMA Medical, Inc.. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 06/05 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18908685.), filed by Sophia Noriega. The new case number is 3:24-cv-989-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court Proof of Service of Summon,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Kira Zhivalyuk,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Deborah J Wilson,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Marla Guzzardo,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Manuel Palma