Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:24-cv-02401
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Raynes & Lawn
Represented By
FRANKLIN P. SOLOMON
Solomon Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
TRAVIS S SWEIGART
Represented By
FRANKLIN P. SOLOMON
Solomon Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Beiler Brothers Roofing
Represented By
JAMES N. TRACY, III
Tansey Tracy LLC
contact info
EVAN O'CONNOR
Burns White LLC
contact info
DAVID M. MCGEADY
Burns White Hickton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/05 1:38 PM
ORDER, ( STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/19/2025 11:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL.) SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/5/25. 5/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Mon 05/05 9:28 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Status Conference, scheduled for May 6, 2025(dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/01 1:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW Settlement Conference held on 5/1/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/09 9:28 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 5/6/25, AT 2:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/8/25. 4/9/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 04/01 3:22 PM
ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED FROM MARCH 31, 2025 UNTIL MAY 31, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/1/25. 4/1/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 01/31 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/25. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/13 9:10 AM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/1/2025 10:00 AM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 12/13/24. 12/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Oral Motion Fri 12/13 9:06 AM
ORDER granting 18 Oral Motion. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 12/13/24.12/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Oral Motion Fri 12/13 9:04 AM
EMAIL Motion..(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 12/10 4:04 PM
ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED FROM DECEMBER 31, 2024 UNTIL MARCH 31, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/10/24. 12/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 09/11 3:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL : Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 9/11/24. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 09/11 3:39 PM
ORDER OF 9/11/24 THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY DECEMBER 31, 2024. A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, JANUARY 31, 2025 AT 11:00AM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/11/24. 9/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/20 11:57 AM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/15/2025 10:00 AM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 8/20/24. 8/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/13 8:31 AM
ORDER, ( SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/11/2024 11:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL.). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/12/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Tue 08/13 12:40 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/12/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/06 11:12 AM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by RAYNES & LAWN, Raynes & Lawn, TRAVIS S SWEIGART, TRAVIS S. SWEIGART.(SOLOMON, FRANKLIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 06/27 2:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES N. TRACY, III, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/27/24.6/27/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 06/27 11:20 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James N. Tracy, III ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17565636.) filed by Beiler Brothers Roofing.Affidavit.(O'CONNOR, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application Form,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/27 10:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beiler Brothers Roofing. Raynes & Lawn waiver sent on 6/13/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (O'CONNOR, EVAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/27 10:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beiler Brothers Roofing. TRAVIS S SWEIGART waiver sent on 6/13/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (O'CONNOR, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Raynes & Lawn, TRAVIS S SWEIGART. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/17/24 (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/11 12:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raynes & Lawn, TRAVIS S SWEIGART, filed by Beiler Brothers Roofing.(O'CONNOR, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 06/05 11:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Raynes & Lawn, TRAVIS S SWEIGART. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/5/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN O'CONNOR on behalf of Beiler Brothers Roofing with Certificate of Service(O'CONNOR, EVAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Beiler Brothers Roofing.(MCGEADY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Beiler Brothers Roofing ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17513010.), filed by Beiler Brothers Roofing.(MCGEADY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form