Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-03349
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 2:24-cv-00408
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael David Sloan
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael David Sloan
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Plaintiff
South Trail Fire Protection & Rescue Service District
Represented By
Laura Jacobs Donaldson
Southwest Florida Water Management District
contact info
Louise R Caro
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
17 17 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 06/05 2:36 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle (associated as of 6/4/2024), 2:24-cv-00408, South Trail Fire Protection & Rescue Service District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03349-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
15 15 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 06/05 2:32 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:24-cv-00408. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: South Carolina. MDL case number: 2873. (RPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Certified copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the panel on 5/23/2024. (RPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 JOINT NOTICE of JPML Transfer of Case to the AFFF MDL by ChemDesign Products, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP(Sloan, Michael) Modified on 5/24/2024 to edit docket text (JDR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
11 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International, PLC for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael) Modified to edit docket text on 5/22/2024 (EVK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by South Trail Fire Protection & Rescue Service District. (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading is stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision on the transfer of this action to the District of South Carolina. The parties are directed to file joint reports informing the Court of the status of the proposed transfer on or before June 8, 2024, and every thirty days thereafter until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision. The parties must inform the Court of the Panel's decision within seven days of its issuance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/8/2024. (DM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ENDORSED ORDER. Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, in filing their corporate disclosures, Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. used an outdated form. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete Doc. 6 from the CM/ECF docket. Within 14 days of this order, Defendants must refile the disclosure using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/8/2024. (DM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
7 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***STRICKEN AND DELETED PER ORDER 8 ***CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Sloan, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/8/2024 (SET). Modified on 5/9/2024 (CTR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by South Trail Fire Protection & Rescue Service District. Filed in State Court on 03/21/2024. (JOS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL All Counsel of Record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/3/2024. (CGW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-408-SPC-KCD. (AA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 24-CA-002287 filed in State Court on 03/21/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22048284 filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.(Sloan, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/3/2024 (JOS). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet