Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00119
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 06, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Francesco Pensiero (1)
Represented By
Tracy Hayes
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Nh
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vanessa Roberts Avery
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amanda S. Oakes
Doj-Usao
contact info
Daniel Cummings
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2024 5:40 AM EDT
Thursday, January 26, 2023
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Francesco Pensiero (1). (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 SEALED MOTION to Seal - by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Sealed Motion as to Francesco Pensiero (1). Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/26/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
Arrest of Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case and to Keep Affidavit Under Seal by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 1/27/2023 to correct docket text (Nuzzi, Tiffany). [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Initial Appearance as to Francesco Pensiero held on 1/27/2023; Detention Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 1/27/2023; Motion Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 1/27/2023 granting5 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Francesco Pensiero (1); granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Francesco Pensiero (1); Added attorney Tracy Hayes for Francesco Pensiero. ( Probable Cause Hearing set for 2/10/2023 12:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge S. Dave Vatti). Defendant detained. Total Time: 10 minutes(Court Reporter Courtsmart.) (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
8 8 USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Francesco Pensiero on 1/27/2023 (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Francesco Pensiero pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No.116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020). Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/27/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Francesco Pensiero. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/27/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
11 11 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Francesco Pensiero re:1 Complaint (Sealed) (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
12 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Francesco Pensiero - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/27/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
13 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amanda S. Oakes appearing for USA (Oakes, Amanda) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
14 14 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Francesco Pensiero (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
16 16 ORDER. The defendant's Consent Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing14 is hereby GRANTED . The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review the charges against the defendant. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including March 10, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for February 10, 2023, is hereby continued to March 10, 2023 at 12:00PM , and the time from February 10, 2023, through and including March 10, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 2/8/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
17 17 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero.(Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Speedy Trial
Friday, March 10, 2023
18 18 ORDER. The defendant's Consent Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing17 is hereby GRANTED . The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review the charges against the defendant. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including June 8, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for March 10, 2023, is hereby continued to June 8, 2023 at 12:00PM , and the time from March 10, 2023, through and including June 8, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 3/10/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
19 19 SEALED MOTION to Seal - by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting19 Sealed Motion as to Francesco Pensiero (1). Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 3/14/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
21 21 SEALED MOTION - by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting21 Sealed Motion as to Francesco Pensiero (1). Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 3/14/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
23 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bond Hearing set for 5/11/2023 02:30 PM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge S. Dave Vatti (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
24 24 MOTION for Bond by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Bond Motion Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 5/11/2023, granting24 Motion for Bond ; Bond set as to Francesco Pensiero (1) $100,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond. Total Time: 1 hours and 17 minutes(Court Reporter Courtsmart.) (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Francesco Pensiero. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 5/11/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
27 27 SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 5/16/2023 to correct file date(Nuzzi, Tiffany). [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
28 28 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
29 29 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Francesco Pensiero in amount of $ 100,000, (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
30 30 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
31 31 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Francesco Pensiero (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
32 32 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
33 33 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Francesco Pensiero (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
34 34 ORDER. The defendant's Consent Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing32 is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review discovery. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including September 8, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for June 8, 2023, is hereby continued to September 8, 2023 at 12:00PM , and the time from June 8, 2023, through and including September 8, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 6/6/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
35 35 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Francesco Pensiero.(Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
36 36 ORDER granting35 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release. Mr. Pensiero is permitted to be transported to, and begin treatment at, Stonehaven on July 5, 2023. All other conditions shall remain in effect. So Ordered. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 7/5/2023. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
37 37 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
38 38 ORDER The defendant's consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing 13 is hereby GRANTED subject to the filing of the defendant's Speedy Trial Waiver. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained. A written waiver of the defendant's right to a hearing shall be filed once it is returned to defense counsel. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review discovery and the charges against the defendant. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for September 08, 2023, is hereby continued to November 07, 2023, at 12:00PM, and the time from September 08, 2023 through and including November 07, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 9/08/2023. ) (Jacques, Djess) Modified on 9/8/2023 (Jacques, Djess). [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 09/08/23 Probable Cause Hearing set for 11/7/2023 12:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge S. Dave Vatti.(Jacques, Djess) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
40 40 Docket Entry Correction: Order 38 on Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero modified to update order text. (Jacques, Djess) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
41 41 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
42 42 WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Francesco Pensiero (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
43 43 ORDER. The defendant's consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing41 is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review discovery and the charges against the defendant. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for November 07, 2023, is hereby continued to January 08, 2023, at 12:00PM, and the time from November 07, 2023 through and including January 08, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 11/06/2023. (Jacques, Djess) Modified on 11/8/2023 to correct order text. (Jacques, Djess). [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
Docket Entry Correction: re 43 Order on Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing. Removed text requesting the filing of a speedy trial waiver since defense counsel had already filed waiver on the docket. (Jacques, Djess) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
44 44 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
45 45 ORDER. The defendant's consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing44 is hereby GRANTED subject to the filing of the defendant's Speedy Trial Waiver. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 21 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is released. A written waiver of the defendant's right to a hearing shall be filed once it is returned to defense counsel. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review discovery and the charges against the defendant. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for January 08, 2024, is hereby continued to March 8, 2024, at 12:00PM, and the time from January 08, 2024, through and including March 08, 2024, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/5/2024. (Jacques, Djess) Modified on 1/9/2024 to adjust text (Jacques, Djess). [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
46 46 WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Francesco Pensiero (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 14, 2024
47 47 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
48 48 ORDER. Based upon defendant's record of compliance with conditions of release and with the consent of the government and the Probation Office, defendant's nunc pro tunc Motion to Modify Conditions of Release to permit him to reside at Horizons is GRANTED. Defendant shall be subject to all rules and regulations of the Horizons facility and its program. All other conditions of release remain in effect. So Ordered.. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 1/18/2024. (Jacques, Djess) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
49 49 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
50 50 WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Francesco Pensiero (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
51 51 ORDER. The Consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing49 is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 21 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is released on bond. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer, and discuss possible resolution. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including May 8, 2024. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for March 8, 2024, is hereby continued to May 8, 2024 at 12:00PM, and the time from March 8, 2024, through and including May 8, 2024, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 3/5/2024. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
52 52 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/8/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge S. Dave Vatti. To join the conference line the parties shall dial: 866-434-5269 and enter the access code: 2006808. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
53 53 Minute Entry:Telephonic Status Conference as to Francesco Pensiero held on 3/8/2024 before Judge S. Dave Vatti. Total Time: 3 minutes(Court Reporter Courtsmart.)(Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
54 54 MOTION for Revocation of Pretrial Release., MOTION Revocation of Release by USA as to Francesco Pensiero. (Oakes, Amanda) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
55 55 Consent MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
56 56 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Francesco Pensiero. (Hayes, Tracy) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
58 58 Probation Form 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Francesco Pensiero. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 5/6/2024. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
57 57 ORDER. The defendant's consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing55 is hereby GRANTED subject to the filing of the defendant's Speedy Trial Waiver. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 21 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is released. A written waiver of the defendant's right to a hearing shall be filed once it is returned to defense counsel. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer and review discovery and the charges against the defendant. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for May 8, 2024, is hereby continued to June 8, 2024, at 12:00PM, and the time from May 8, 2024 through and including June 8, 2024, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 5/7/2024. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
59 59 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bond Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
60 60 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Plea Hearing set for 5/29/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Murphy, T) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
61 61 Minute Entry: Bond Hearing and Motion Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 5/14/2024, before Judge S. Dave Vatti, re54 MOTION for Revocation of Pretrial Release filed by USA,56 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Francesco Pensiero; Order entered denying54 Motion to Revoke Modification of Release as to Francesco Pensiero; granting56 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Francesco Pensiero. Total Time: 23 minutes(Court Reporter Courtsmart.) (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
62 62 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in detail at a hearing conducted on May 14, 2024, the government's Motion for Revocation of Release, ECF No.54 , is DENIED and the defendant's Motion to Modify Release Conditions, ECF No.56 , is GRANTED such that defendant shall be permitted to reside with his sister-in-law and mother at their residence. Defendant shall also be subject to a curfew determined at the discretion of the supervising pretrial services officer and which shall be enforced by monitoring technology to be selected by the supervising officer. All other conditions of release remain in effect. So Ordered. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 5/15/2024. (Jacques, D) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
63 63 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Francesco Pensiero: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/29/2024 Waiver and Plea and Sentence set for 6/3/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Murphy, T) [3:23-mj-00059-SDV]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
64 64 INFORMATION as to Francesco Pensiero (1), count 1. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
65 65 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Francesco Pensiero. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
66 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden:Waiver/Plea Hearing held on 6/3/2024 as to Francesco Pensiero. Plea entered by Francesco Pensiero (1), Guilty as to Count 1. Detention Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 6/3/2024 and Motion Hearing as to Francesco Pensiero held on 6/3/2024. Defendant will remain on bond. Total time 49 minutes. (Court Reporter Heather Ireland.)(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
67 67 ORDER as to Francesco Pensiero Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020). Signed by Judge Victor A. Boldenon 6/3/2024. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/3/2024. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
68 68 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Francesco Pensiero. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]