Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00121
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 06, 2024 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (1)
Represented By
Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Fallgatter & Catlin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elisibeth Adams
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2024 5:59 AM EDT
Thursday, May 09, 2024
Arrest of Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo on 5/9/2024 (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (1). (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey: Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo held on 5/9/2024. (Digital) (Interpreter/Language: Andrea Anastasi-Spanish) (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo. (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to Continue the detention hearing by USA as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo. (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION (granting 4 oral motion to continue detention hearing) as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (Status of Counsel/Detention Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 03:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/9/2024. (TSP) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Curtis Scott Fallgatter appearing for Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (Fallgatter, Curtis) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTE Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert: Status of Counsel/Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo held on 5/14/2024. (DIGITAL) (Interpreter/Language: Andrea Anastasi/Spanish) (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (filed in open court). (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER regarding 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/14/2024. (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/14/2024. (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo: Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing set for 6/3/2024 at 02:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5D before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (NK) [3:24-mj-01164-LLL]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
14 14 INFORMATION as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (1) count(s) 1. (BGR)
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (BGR)
Related: [-]
16 16 MINUTE Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert: Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo held on 6/3/2024. (DIGITAL) (Interpreter/Language: Edward Hogan/Spanish) (NK)
Related: [-]
17 17 CONSENT regarding entry of a plea of guilty as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (filed in open court). (NK)
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of maximum penalty, elements of offense, personalization of elements and factual basis by USA as to Juan Carlos Carmona-Jarillo (Filed in Open Court; Original returned to AUSA). (NK)
Related: [-]