Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02211
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 06, 2024 4:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama (1)
Represented By
Christina M. Norton
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2024 5:02 AM CDT
Saturday, June 01, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama (ll)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance in Person as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama held on 6/3/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (B. Espinosa) as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama, (Detention Hearing set for 6/12/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 6/12/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Jesus Anchondo-Balderrama. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]