South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:24-cv-03369
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
33 33 misc Document E-Mailed Thu 11/07 2:58 PM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED32 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Report and Recommendation, to Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, PO Box 219, Moncks Corner, SC 29461 leah.dupree@berkeleycountysc.gov (hcor, )
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Report and Recommendation Thu 11/07 2:33 PM
ORDER The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation is AFFIRMED and incorporated into this order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED, and defendants' motions to dismiss are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/07/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
29 29 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Tue 09/24 3:06 PM
OBJECTION to27 Report and Recommendation by City of Conway, Conway Police Department. Reply to Objections due by 10/8/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
28 28 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Tue 09/24 1:33 PM
OBJECTION to27 Report and Recommendation by South Carolina Department of Social Services, The. Reply to Objections due by 10/8/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ganes, Elloree)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
27 27 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 09/10 10:58 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is therefore RECOMMENDED, that Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 15) be GRANTED, and that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 5, 13) be DISMISSED AS MOOT. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/10/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/03 10:19 AM
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/3/2024.(dgar)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/30 12:01 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by City of Conway, Conway Police Department. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Huff, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/20 2:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by South Carolina Department of Social Services, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/27/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ganes, Elloree)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Michael Sobocinski on behalf of South Carolina Department of Social Services, The (Sobocinski, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/19 6:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by City of Goose Creek, Goose Creek Police Department.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/26/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Haarsgaard, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/19 5:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by City of Conway, Conway Police Department.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/26/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/30 3:40 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/17/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 7/31/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/19/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2025, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2025, Discovery due by 4/21/2025, Motions due by 6/18/2025, Mediation Due by 5/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/30/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 07/30 2:56 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Erica C. Serrano.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 07/30 12:42 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Conway, City of Goose Creek, Conway Police Department, Goose Creek Police Department, South Carolina Department of Social Services, The.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 07/30 12:38 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by City of Goose Creek.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Wed 07/03 2:14 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Erica C. Serrano. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/03 2:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Erica C. Serrano.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/10/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/27 12:26 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Conway, Conway Police Department. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/26 8:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/17/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/31/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 7/31/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/21/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 9/20/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/21/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/21/2024, Discovery due by 12/20/2024, Mediation Due by 1/21/2025, Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/26/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 06/25 2:36 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Conway, Conway Police Department.(Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/25 2:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Conway, Conway Police Department.(Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/20 3:02 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Erica C. Serrano.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/20 1:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Erica C. Serrano.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/27/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/13 4:15 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Social Services, The.(Ganes, Elloree)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/13 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Department of Social Services, The.(Ganes, Elloree)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Thu 06/06 11:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by City of Goose Creek, Goose Creek Police Department. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/06 11:14 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Goose Creek.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/06 8:10 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Goose Creek, Goose Creek Police Department.(dgar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 06/06 8:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas for the County of Berkeley, case number 2024-CP 08-00750 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11807216), filed by Goose Creek Police Department, City of Goose Creek.(dgar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents