Minnesota District Court
Judge:David S Doty
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:24-cv-02175
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2024 2:21 AM CST
Defendant
Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC
Represented By
Keith P Spiller
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Larina A Alton
Sauro & Alton, PLLC
contact info
Michael J. Myers
Thompson Hine
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy W. Johnson
Represented By
Alf E Sivertson
Law Offices Of Sivertson & Barrette, PA
contact info
Anja Michelle Sivertson
Law Offices Of Sivertson & Barrette, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
25 25 notice Notice to Attorney - Retiring MJ Case Reassigned Wed 03/12 3:48 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 24cv2175 DSD/ECW . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and conferences before the magistrate judge in this case will be cancelled unless otherwise indicated by the new MJ courtroom deputy. (JME)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 1 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Thu 01/16 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
23 23 notice Notice - Judge Practice Pointers Fri 10/04 11:03 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Doty's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (KAD)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order of Entry Fri 10/04 10:54 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION PROCEDURE Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 10/4/2024.(KAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
21 21 7 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 10/01 3:54 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2025. Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 5/15/2025. Motions (disp) due by 7/15/2025. Ready for trial due by 11/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/1/2024.(JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
20 20 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 09/30 4:51 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/30/2024: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Telephone Conference Time: 4:15 p.m. 4:21 p.m. Total Time: 6 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Alf Sivertson For Defendant(s): Michael Myers; Larina Alton PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
19 19 6 pgs misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 09/16 4:06 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Timothy W. Johnson. Jointly Signed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC.(Sivertson, Alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 14 pgs order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 08/02 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2024 at 04:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/2/2024. (HAM)
Related: [-]
17 17 7 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/02 8:34 AM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 7 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/15 11:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. filed by Timothy W. Johnson. No summons requested. (Sivertson, Alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 order Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Tue 07/09 4:22 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER in Response to13 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 14-day extension request is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint on or before July 22, 2024 in order to establish complete diversity jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/9/2024.(EPD)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/09 10:50 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith P Spiller for Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC.; granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Myers for Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/9/2024. (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 1 pgs misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/08 3:10 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timothy W. Johnson . (Sivertson, Alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 2:30 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Myers. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11170675 filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 2:23 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith P. Spiller. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11170580 filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/02 9:05 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must file its Answer to the Amended Complaint or other responsive pleading by August 2, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2024. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 1 pgs respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Mon 07/01 1:47 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC.(Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
8 8 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Fri 06/28 12:36 PM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Keith P. Spiller, Michael Myers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 2 pgs misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 06/27 1:32 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC.(Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/27 1:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint filed by Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/27 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Larina A Alton on behalf of Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (Alton, Larina)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 06/21 10:15 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Johnson Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/21/2024. (EPD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/06 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC. (kt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 06/06 2:43 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2175 DSD/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/06 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Matrix Packaging Machinery LLC (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11098853) filed by Timothy W Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Sivertson, Alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet