Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:24-cv-00821
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2024 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Abruzzi's Italian Cucina
9745 Us-30
Irwin, PA 15642
Represented By
Thomas M. Pohl
Burns White LLC
contact info
Mary-Jo Rebelo
Burns White LLC
contact info
Courtney C Brennan
Burns White LLC
contact info
Defendant
Beverly Pasquarelli
individually and as owner of Abruzzi's Italian Cucina 1120 10th Avenue
Irwin, PA 15642
Represented By
Thomas M. Pohl
Burns White LLC
contact info
Mary-Jo Rebelo
Burns White LLC
contact info
Courtney C Brennan
Burns White LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amato Pasquarelli
Represented By
Thomas M. Pohl
Burns White LLC
contact info
Mary-Jo Rebelo
Burns White LLC
contact info
Courtney C Brennan
Burns White LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Graham
470 Country Hills Dr
Irwin, PA 15642
Represented By
Brian D. Farrington
Charlton Law
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli, and Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/12/24. (eca)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
29 29 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/09 7:24 AM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of28 Report of Mediation, all deadlines in this matter are terminated. The Court will await the filing of a stipulation of dismissal to close this case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/09/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
28 28 adr Report of Mediation Tue 04/08 1:27 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 4/8/2025. Case has been resolved. DAVID WHITE terminated. Attorney David B. White terminated. David B. White, Mediator The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . (White, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 adr Neutral's Notice of ADR Proceeding Fri 03/07 9:26 AM
Notice of ADR proceeding: The litigants are advised that at the conclusion of the ADR process they must submit a completed questionnaire to the Clerk of Courts. The questionnaire is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov and click on the ADR icon. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/8/2025 09:00 AM. (White, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 02/19 10:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. David White is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/19/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Case Management Order Wed 02/19 10:34 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 03/14/25; Joinder of Parties due 03/14/25; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 03/05/25; Discovery ends 06/20/25; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 06/23/25; Call parameters outlined herein; Fee records due by the 28th of each month; First disclosure due by 03/28/25; Summary Judgment due by 07/07/25; Response to Summary Judgment due by 08/07/25; Reply brief due by 08/21/25; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/19/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Wed 02/19 10:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/19/2025. Case management deadlines established and ADR discussed. The appropriate orders will follow. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's only notice on the matter. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 order Protective Order Tue 02/18 9:54 AM
ORDER IMPLEMENTING Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/18/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
22 22 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 02/10 4:43 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. (Pohl, Thomas)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 02/10 4:40 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pohl, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (LCvR 16.1.D)
Monday, January 13, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 8:00 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/3/2025. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/10/2025. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/13/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 4:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. (Pohl, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 order Judgment (Rule 58) Thu 12/12 10:46 AM
JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58. Final judgment is entered in the form of dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Amato Pasquarelli and Beverly Pasquarelli. Defendants Amato Pasquarelli and Beverly Pasquarelli are hereby TERMINATED as parties in this action. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/12/24. (eca)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 12/12 10:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/12/24. (eca)
Related: [-]
16 16 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 12/12 10:42 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli, and Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/12/24. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Fri 10/25 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Pohl on behalf of Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Attorney Mary-Jo Rebelo terminated. (Pohl, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Wed 09/18 10:00 AM
Errata re13 Reply to Response to Motion, by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Reason for Correction: Adding counsel address, phone number and email address. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Wed 09/18 9:23 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re13 Reply to Response to Motion. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, specifically address, telephone number, and e-mail address. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) and refile the document using the Errata event. (keh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/17 4:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,10 Brief in Support of Motion,12 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
12 12 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 9:27 AM
BRIEF in Opposition re9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jordan Graham. (Farrington, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Mon 08/19 10:45 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint due by 9/10/2024; Reply due by 9/17/2024. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/19/24. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
10 10 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 08/16 9:20 AM
BRIEF in Support re9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/16 9:18 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re1 COMPLAINT, by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 06/18 11:58 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Tue 06/18 10:35 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 6/25/2024. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/17 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney C Brennan on behalf of Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. (Brennan, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/17 3:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amato Pasquarelli. Amato Pasquarelli waiver sent on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/17 3:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beverly Pasquarelli. Beverly Pasquarelli waiver sent on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/17 3:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Abruzzi's Italian Cucina. Abruzzi's Italian Cucina waiver sent on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/17 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary-Jo Rebelo on behalf of Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Pasquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli. Related [+]
Related: [-] belo, Mary-Jo
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 07, 2024
2 2 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/07 8:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/7/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 06/07 8:48 AM
Judge William S. Stickman presiding. (cww)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Thu 06/06 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Abruzzi's Italian Cucina, Amato Paquarelli, Beverly Pasquarelli (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8300096), filed by Jordan Graham. (Farrington, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/06 3:57 PM
Judge Joy Flowers Conti added. (keh)
Related: [-]