Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Sim Lake
Referred: Richard W Bennett
Case #: 4:24-cv-02148
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2024 2:40 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
Alanna Maza
Conflict Check Party
Global One Bancshares, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Global One Financial, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Taylor White
Conflict Check Party
Winstead PC
Defendant
Does 1 to 50
Represented By
Ciara Rebecca Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean K. Lee
1144 S St. Andrews Pl.
Los Angeles, CA 90019
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Global One Bank
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Tom Van Arsdel
Winstead PC
contact info
Matthew Alan Pyle
Andrews Myers, P.C.
contact info
Ciara Rebecca Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info
Defendant
Jeung-Ho Park
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Tom Van Arsdel
Winstead PC
contact info
Matthew Alan Pyle
Andrews Myers, P.C.
contact info
Ciara Rebecca Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2024 5:21 PM CDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2024-26564 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31729525) filed by Jeung-Ho Park, Global One Bank. (Van Arsdel, Tom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet