California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-00994
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441cla Removal - Consumer Leasing Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 37-02024-00019696-CU-BT-CTL
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2024 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Andrea L McDonald-Hicks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Peter Yould
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
Samara A. Mohammad Odeh
Represented By
Octavio Cardona-Loya, II
Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mazin O. Farha
Represented By
Octavio Cardona-Loya, II
Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2024
ORDER granting Joint Motion to Dismiss [Doc.5].Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 07/25/2024. (mjw)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, July 25, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 07/25 3:47 PM
ORDER granting Joint Motion to Dismiss [Doc.5 ].Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 07/25/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Tue 07/23 10:21 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice(Cardona-Loya, Octavio) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 06/20 3:43 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/20/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/13 4:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Yould, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/06 4:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navy Federal Credit Union. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 06/06 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18912128.), filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. The new case number is 3:24-cv-994-W-KSC. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proof of Service