California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-04761
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Tiffany L. Nearon
Represented By
L Scott Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
David E Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc.
Represented By
L Scott Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
David E Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Luz Zendejas
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, August 09, 2024
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 08/09 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/16 2:13 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a notice of settlement on July 15, 2024. This action is therefore dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
18 18 notice Settlement Mon 07/15 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
17 17 misc Errata Mon 07/08 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. correcting REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Tiffany L. Nearon16 (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 07/08 11:54 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Tiffany L. Nearon filed by plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/26 2:52 PM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING UNRUH ACT CLAIM by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. See document for details. (gk)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Response Tue 06/25 1:03 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejasto Order to Show Cause,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Thursday, June 20, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 06/20 3:42 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc. answer now due 8/2/2024; Tiffany L. Nearon answer now due 8/2/2024, filed by Defendants Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc.; Tiffany L. Nearon.(Attorney David E Karlin added to party Tiffany L. Nearon(pty:dft), Attorney David E Karlin added to party Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc.(pty:dft))(Karlin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/17 10:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas, upon Defendant Tiffany L. Nearon served on 6/12/2024, answer due 7/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TIFFANY L. NEARSON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LARSON FAMILY REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/17 10:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas, upon Defendant Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc. served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon OANH PHUNG, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/11 8:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff within 14 days after entry of this Order to show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss without prejudice her Unruh Act claim under Section 1367(c). See order for details and deadline to respond. (jgr)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/10 2:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Tiffany L. Nearon, Olivia Star Nails Spa, Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/10 9:48 AM
Standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 06/10 9:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 06/10 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 06/10 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 06/06 4:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 06/06 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 06/06 4:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 06/06 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37608527 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Luz Zendejas(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]