Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:24-cv-02466
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
Truist Bank
Represented By
Joseph Hubert Stuhrenberg
Burr & Forman Llp - Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Saffold
Represented By
Esther Nneka Oise
Oise Law Group PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 09/13/2024
Represented By
Allison Giardina Rhadans
Equifax Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 10/30/2024


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/25 5:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Truist Bank by Amanda Saffold. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 11:18 AM
ORDER. The parties having informed the Court of settlement, the Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to administratively close this case. These parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/12/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/12 11:19 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/05 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Truist Bank by Amanda Saffold (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/16 1:44 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery The Scheduling Order is hereby modified to extend the time period for the parties to conduct fact discovery through and including April 14, 2025 and for the parties to file summary judgment motions through and including May 16, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 1/16/25. (djs)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/16 9:00 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Scheduling Order (D.E. 21) Discovery and Summary Judgment Deadlines re:21 Scheduling Order by Truist Bank.(Stuhrenberg, Joseph) Modified on 1/16/2025 (djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
22 22 4 pgs order Order Fri 11/01 3:52 PM
ORDER MODIFYING LOCAL RULES REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/1/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/01 2:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:20 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 2/13/2025. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/1/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
20 20 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 10/31 12:20 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Truist Bank. (Stuhrenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 10/30 8:56 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/29 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Amanda Saffold (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 10/28 12:54 PM
Clerk's Notation re18 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 7:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Amanda Saffold. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 10/18 4:46 PM
ORDER. The parties are therefore ORDERED to conduct an early planning conference under Local Rule 16.1 if they have not already done so. The parties are also ORDERED to file a JPRDP under Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days. This order does not modify the end of discovery or any other deadlines in the case. The Local Rules also require that counsel for a private (defined as non-governmental) party file at the time of first appearance a certificate of interested persons and a corporate disclosure statement. LR 3.3, NDGa. There is no record of Plaintiff having done so. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a certificate of interested persons within 14 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/18/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/24 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Amanda Saffold (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 09/16 5:16 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff filed this action on June 5, 2024. (Doc.1 ). Plaintiff filed a return of service indicating that Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. was served on June 25, 2024, (Doc.4 ). The deadline for Experian to answer or file a responsive pleading was 21 days from the date of service, meaning that its response to the complaint was due July 16, 2024. To date, Experian has not responded to the complaint or otherwise appeared in the case. Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the Court how she wishes to proceed within 14 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Defendant Experian at the address listed on the summons, (Doc.4 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 9/16/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/16 12:16 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Truist Bank. Discovery ends on 2/13/2025.(Stuhrenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/16 5:20 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re15 Order. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 09/13 12:02 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (ces)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/12 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Amanda Saffold (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 09/12 12:00 PM
Clerk's Notation re11 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/09 9:02 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Truist shall file and serve its response to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 9/9/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. (Stuhrenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 9:12 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Truist Bank.(Stuhrenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Hubert Stuhrenberg on behalf of Truist Bank (Stuhrenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 08/22 3:25 PM
Clerk's Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/15 11:14 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer due 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/15/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 5:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Rhadans, Allison)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 08/14 5:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Rhadans, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/09 11:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Saffold. Truist Bank waiver mailed on 7/8/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Mon 07/08 11:58 AM
Return of Service Executed by Amanda Saffold. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/20 1:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Saffold. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (Oise, Esther)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 06/06 9:19 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Truist Bank.(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Experian Information Solutions
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/06 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amanda Saffold. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13483894)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet