Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-03309
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Innotex Corp
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By
Paige Pavone
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
James L Stengel
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
EIDP Inc
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
Plaintiff
RJ A. Lindell
Represented By
August J Matteis, Jr
Weisbrod Matteis And Copley PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/27 1:28 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to 2:24-cv-03239 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-02917; 2:24-cv-02914; 2:24-cv-02916 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-03242; 2:24-cv-02919; 2:24-cv-02908; 2:24-cv-02913; 2:24-cv-03241; 2:24-cv-03315 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-02178; 2:24-cv-03229; 2:24-cv-02915; 2:24-cv-03228; 2:24-cv-03279; 2:24-cv-03230; 2:24-cv-03309 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-02613 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-02918; 2:24-cv-03295; 2:24-cv-02911 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-03244; 2:24-cv-03299 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-03240 (CLOSED per notice of voluntary dismissal); 2:24-cv-03297. The Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6421-1) for failure to serve executed and completed Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets (Dkt. No. 6421 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02178-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02908-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02913-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02914-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02915-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02917-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02918-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-02919-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03279-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03295-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03297-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03228-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03229-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03230-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03241-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03242-RMG; (7) in case 2:24-cv-03244-RMG) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Plaintiffs Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6465-1) remain. The claims of the remaining Plaintiffs listed in Defendants Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6421-1) are dismissed without prejudice, subject to reinstatement upon the service of executed and completed PFSs pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5, paragraphs 22 through 26. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/27/2025.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/12 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephanie Nearing, Larry T. Raughton, Mario J. Bickham, Robert William Rudel, RJ A. Lindell, Richard Geiss, Samuel E. Allan, Jr, Jack A. SavoAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Matteis, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 11/27 3:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets by W.L. Gore & Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cheffo, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A to MTD Failure to Provide TOG PFS - Weisbrod Matteis,
Att: 2 Ex. B - 9.25.2024 Letter
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Mon 06/24 3:54 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/31/2024), RJ A. Lindell v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03309-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Oregon (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/06 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/06 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11798796.), filed by RJ A. Lindell. Service due by 8/29/2024 (jbin, )
Related: [-]