Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00222
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Gray (1)
Represented By
Marna S Franklin
Franklin Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Stephen C Hoch
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2024 3:14 AM CDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to Michael Gray (1). (cps) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America as to Michael Gray. (cps) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Michael Gray (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/26/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
Case unsealed as to Michael Gray (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
5 5 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Gray (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Marna S Franklin for Michael Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/14/2024. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Michael Gray held on 5/14/2024. Detention Hearing set for 5/22/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/22/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Michael Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/14/2024. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
9 9 DPPA-ORDER as to Michael Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/14/2024. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
10 10 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marna S Franklin appearing for Michael Gray (Franklin, Marna) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Gray. Detention Hearing set for 5/22/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/22/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Preliminary Hearing as to Michael Gray waived on 5/22/2024. Detention Hearing as to Michael Gray waived on 5/22/2024. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Michael Gray (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Michael Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/22/2024. (rb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 MOTION for Order titled, "Defendants Motion Requesting Release of Proceeds" by Michael Gray.(kb) [5:24-mj-00384-STE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1- Supporting Documents
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 INDICTMENT as to Michael Gray (1) count(s) 1 and forfeiture allegations. (ekw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Michael Gray