Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00826
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 2:58 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alexander Rodriguez-Pena (1)
Terminated: 06/04/2024
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2024 4:21 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
1 1 Arrest (Rule 5/Rule 32.1) of Alexander Rodriguez-Pena (rqr)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Initial Appearance as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena held on 6/4/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alexander Rodriguez-Pena (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Alexander Rodriguez-Pena. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena. (Identity/Detention Hearing set for 6/7/2024 9:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer.). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER - Rule 5/Rule 32.1 as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena. (rqr)
Related: [-]
7 7 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT/DIVISION as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena. Defendant committed to District of Puerto Rico.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice to District of Puerto Rico of a Rule 5, Rule 32, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Alexander Rodriguez-Pena. Your case number is: 24-527(M). Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to TXWD_ECF_help@txwd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (rqr)
Related: [-]