California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00163
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 12:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Gary Klopfenstein (1)
Represented By
David Warren Dratman
David W. Dratman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Matthew Thuesen
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Eastern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jan 13 2025
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Gary Klopfenstein signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2025 CONTINUING Status Conference to 5/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)

Docket last updated: 11/14/2024 5:55 AM PST
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 6 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) as to Gary Klopfenstein (1) count(s) 1-10. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to Gary Klopfenstein. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]