Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00138
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Samuel Jackson (1)
Represented By
Harry E White
Nickols White Solomon
contact info
John Eric Nickols
Nickols & White PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 9:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 4 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Samuel Jackson (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Arrest of Samuel Jackson appeared on a writ (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 WITHDRAWN SEE ORDER11 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Samuel Jackson. Person subject to writ must appear on instanter at Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (certified copy to USM) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/17/2024) (mcrd) Modified on 4/22/2024 (mcrd). [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney John Eric Nickols for Samuel Jackson appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/17/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Samuel Jackson held on 4/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 4/17/2024 appeared on a writ; Deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing atty entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 5/22/24 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Frank Gatto for Laura Montes; Defense - Eric Nickols. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Lee.) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Samuel Jackson (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Samuel Jackson: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/17/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Samuel Jackson (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Samuel Jackson. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/2024 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/17/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
10 10 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Preliminary & Detention Hearing NOT HELD on 4/22/2024 as to Samuel Jackson; Court finds PC; both sides informed the court that the underlying state charge has been dismissed therefore the court will w/draw the order for writ; deft waives PC & detention; o/detention pending trial entered; deft continued in federal custody (no longer on writ). Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Eric Nickols. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Lee.) (mcrd) Modified on 4/22/2024 (mcrd). [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Samuel Jackson: writ issued on April 17, 2024 is no longer required...order for writ 03 is set aside and withdrawn. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/22/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting8 Motion for Detention as to Samuel Jackson (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/22/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
13 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Samuel Jackson (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
14 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue as to Samuel Jackson (1) until June 6, 2024 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(i) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/26/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ] (Entered: 04/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
15 15 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Eric Nickols filed by Samuel Jackson (Nickols, John) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
16 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John Eric Nickols is withdrawn from further representation as to Samuel Jackson (1) an attorney from the Criminal Justice Act Panel of attorneys to be appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/8/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Harry E White for Samuel Jackson appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/8/2024) (mcrd) [4:24-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
18 18 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Samuel Jackson (1) count(s) 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (wxc)
Related: [-]
20 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Samuel Jackson: Arraignment set for 6/18/2024 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. Attorneys and Defendant to be in the courtroom 15 minutes prior to the hearing start time. Waivers of arraignment are encouraged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 6/5/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]