Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01175
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 2:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Kevin Joshua Contreras (1)
Represented By
Jose Montes, Jr.
Jose Montes, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Raymundo Eli Rojas
Ray Rojas Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Brian Dellinger (2)
Represented By
Louis E. Lopez, Jr.
Attorney At Law
contact info
Angelina Lugo
Law Office Of Angelina Lugo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shannon Reiter Holderfield
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 15 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Kevin Joshua Contreras. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (jg1)
GPO Nov 18 2024
ORDER accepting re 51 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Kevin Joshua Contreras. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1)

Docket last updated: 06/07/2024 4:00 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
Arrest of Kevin Joshua Contreras, Brian Dellinger (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Brian Dellinger by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Kevin Joshua Contreras by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Kevin Joshua Contreras, Brian Dellinger. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Kevin Joshua Contreras. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Brian Dellinger. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Raymundo Eli Rojas. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Angelina Lugo. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda: Initial Appearance as to Kevin Joshua Contreras held on 5/10/2024 NO BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Kevin Joshua Contreras (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda: Initial Appearance as to Brian Dellinger held on 5/10/2024 NO BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brian Dellinger (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Kevin Joshua Contreras, ( Detention Hearing set for 5/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton, Preliminary Hearing set for 5/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Kevin Joshua Contreras. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Brian Dellinger, ( Detention Hearing set for 5/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton, Preliminary Hearing set for 5/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Brian Dellinger. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kevin Joshua Contreras (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brian Dellinger (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Shannon Reiter Holderfield appearing for USA. . Attorney Shannon Reiter Holderfield added to party USA(pty:pla) (Holderfield, Shannon) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
ORAL WITHDRAWAL of Motion by USA as to Brian Dellinger re3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond filed by USA (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER SETTING AGREED BOND as to Brian Dellinger, $10,000 10% CD Agreed Bond set as to Brian Dellinger (2) by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Brian Dellinger by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL WITHDRAWAL of Motion by USA as to Kevin Joshua Contreras re2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond filed by USA (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER SETTING AGREED BOND as to Kevin Joshua Contreras, $10,000 C/CS Agreed Bond set as to Kevin Joshua Contreras (1) by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
ORAL Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Kevin Joshua Contreras by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kevin Joshua Contreras (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Brian Dellinger (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton: Detention Hearing as to Kevin Joshua Contreras held on 5/15/2024 AGREED BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Kevin Joshua Contreras, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Kevin Joshua Contreras (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton: Detention Hearing as to Brian Dellinger held on 5/15/2024 AGREED BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Brian Dellinger, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brian Dellinger (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
18 18 SECURED Bond Filed as to Brian Dellinger in amount of $ 10,000.(bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 UNREDACTED BOND
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 SECURED Bond Filed as to Kevin Joshua Contreras in amount of $ 10,000.(bg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 UNREDACTED BOND
Thursday, May 30, 2024
20 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance by Kevin Joshua Contreras.(Montes, Jose) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Brian Dellinger. (Lopez, Louis) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
Text Order GRANTING21 Motion to Substitute Attorney Louis Elias Lopez in place of Angelina Lugo as defense counsel for to Brian Dellinger (2) Entered by Judge Anne T. Berton. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion to Substitute as Attorney Jose Montes, Jr., in place of Raymundo Eli Rojas as defense counsel for Kevin Joshua Contreras (1) Entered by Judge Anne T. Berton. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mg2) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
Attorney Angelina Lugo terminated as to Brian Dellinger. (em) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Attorney Raymundo Eli Rojas terminated as to Kevin Joshua Contreras. (em) [3:24-mj-01950-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bot1)
Related: [-]
22 22 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Kevin Joshua Contreras (1) count(s) 1, 2, Brian Dellinger (2) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
24 24 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Kevin Joshua Contreras (bot1)
Related: [-]
25 25 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Brian Dellinger (bot1)
Related: [-]