Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01201
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 2:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (1)
Represented By
Sandra S. Lewis
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2024 4:11 AM CDT
Saturday, May 11, 2024
Arrest of Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano. (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano. (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano held on 5/14/2024 NO BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter (E. Gallegos) required as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (Court Reporter ERO.) (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano, ( Detention Hearing set for 5/22/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,, Preliminary Hearing set for 5/22/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mv) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sandra S. Lewis appearing for Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano . Attorney Sandra S. Lewis added to party Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano(pty:dft) (Lewis, Sandra) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (Lewis, Sandra) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (bot2) [3:24-mj-01996-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Christopher Abraham Zuniga-Soriano (bot2)
Related: [-]