Wyoming District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00055
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2024 1:55 AM MDT
Defendant
Michael Picard (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan C Coppom
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2024 3:16 AM MDT
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 Rule 5 - Hearing to be held in the District of Wyoming. Documents received from the Northern District of Florida (Pensacola) include Docket sheet, Amended Petition to Revoke Supervision and Executed Summons as to Michael Picard. (Court Staff, stbd)
Related: [-]
2 2 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Picard, VIA ZOOM - NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. ***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Initial Appearance - Rule 5 Proceedings set for 6/7/2024 02:15 PM before Honorable R Michael Shickich. (Court Staff, stbd)
Related: [-]