Original Case: 1:24-cv-00774

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-05151
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2024
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 28, 2024 10:40 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Department of Interior
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Debra A. Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, acting in her official capacity
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United States Bureau of Ocean Management
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Elizabeth M.W. Klein, Director of United States Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, acting in her official capacity
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gina M. Raimondo, Secretary of Commerce, acting in her official capacity
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Janet Coit, Director of the National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Virginia Electric and Power Company, a utility corporation, doing business as Dominion Energy Virginia
Represented By
James Michael Auslander
Beveridge & Diamond, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Committee for Constructive Tomorrow
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Roger Joseph Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Nancie Gail Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Heartland Institute, a non-profit corporation
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Roger Joseph Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Nancie Gail Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Craig Rucker, an individual
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Roger Joseph Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Nancie Gail Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Legal and Policy Center, a non-profit corporation
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Roger Joseph Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Nancie Gail Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Peter Flaherty, an individual
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Roger Joseph Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info
Nancie Gail Marzulla
Marzulla Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/28/2024 10:40 AM EDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5151
Related: [-]
21 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2058154] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-00774-LLA filed by Committee for Constructive Tomorrow, Peter Flaherty, Heartland Institute, National Legal and Policy Center and Craig Rucker. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5151 24-5151
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2058168] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/08/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/22/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/08/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/08/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/08/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/22/2024 24-5151
Related: [-]
1 pgs ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [2058214] filed by Ezekiel A. Peterson on behalf of Appellees Janet Coit, Debra Haaland, Department of Interior, Elizabeth M.W. Klein, National Marine Fisheries Service, Gina M. Raimondo and United States Bureau of Ocean Management. 24-5151 (Peterson, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]