Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00575
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
Konicek & Dillon, P.C.
Represented By
Geralyn M. Passaro
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Esq. Amir Tahmassebi
Represented By
Geralyn M. Passaro
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Gregory P. Holder
Represented By
Gregory P. Holder
Zinober Diana & Monteverde, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Laveranues Coles
Represented By
Steven Mark Katzman
Katzman Wasserman Bennardini &rubinstein
contact info
Charles J. Bennardini, II
Katzman Wasserman Bennardini & Rubinstein, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Trouble Livin Life, LLC
Represented By
Steven Mark Katzman
Katzman Wasserman Bennardini &rubinstein
contact info
Charles J. Bennardini, II
Katzman Wasserman Bennardini & Rubinstein, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 4:25 PM
NOTICE by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Osgathorpe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Expert Buchanan's February 4, 2025 Deposition Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Expert Buchanan's May 20, 2017 Deposition Transcript
30 30 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/30 12:06 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi.(Osgathorpe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Expert Buchanan's 2025 Testimony,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Expert Buchanan's 2017 Testimony
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 04/16 3:43 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 07/25/2025 9:00am before Gregory P. Holder. (Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/17 12:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Geralyn M. Passaro, Esq. and the law firm of Litchfield Cavo, LLP are relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Defendants in this matter, but they shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/17/2025. (TAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
27 27 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/16 4:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Geralyn M. Passaro to Withdraw as Attorney by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. (Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/15 2:07 PM
NOTICE by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email (Osgathorpe, John)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/15 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John David Osgathorpe on behalf of Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. Lead Counsel: John Osgathorpe. (Osgathorpe, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
24 24 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 9:12 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESTO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT 8 Amended Complaint by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. (Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 09/04 5:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Defendants shall separately file their Amended Answer and Amended Affirmative Defenses on or before September 11, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/4/2024. (JRM)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 09/04 10:38 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2024; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/3/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/3/2025; Discovery due by 8/1/2025; Conduct mediation hearing by 8/15/2025 (Lead counsel to coordinate dates); Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2025; All other motions due by 12/2/2025; Pretrial statement due by 1/5/2026; Trial Status Conference set for 1/13/2026 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger; Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 2/2/2026 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/4/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
21 21 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Tue 09/03 11:38 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend19 Answer to amended complaint by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi.(Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
20 20 misc Case Management Report Tue 08/20 5:34 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 08/01 2:15 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 8 Amended Complaint by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi.(Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 07/09 4:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint is due on or before August 1, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/9/2024. (JRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 07/08 12:36 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Amended Complaint by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. (Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 2:11 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. (Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Wed 07/03 2:10 PM
NOTICE of LEAD COUNSEL Appearance by Geralyn M. Passaro on behalf of Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi (Passaro, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 06/24 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven Mark Katzman on behalf of Laveranues Coles, Trouble Livin Life, LLC. Lead Counsel: Steven M. Katzman. (Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 10:59 AM
Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Laveranues Coles, Trouble Livin Life, LLC. (Katzman, Steven) Modified to edit docket text on 6/14/2024 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Strike Thu 06/13 12:36 PM
ORDER to strike re: 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Trouble Livin Life, LLC, Laveranues Coles. On or before June 19, 2024, Plaintiffs shall file a proper Certificate of Service with its Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/13/2024. (JRM)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Thu 06/13 10:13 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 7 Order to Show Cause. The Court is satisfied, at this stage of the proceedings, that Plaintiffs have adequately alleged diversity of citizenship. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/13/2024. (MDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/12 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Laveranues Coles, Trouble Livin Life, LLC. (Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Response to order to show cause Wed 06/12 3:26 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 Order to show cause filed by Laveranues Coles, Trouble Livin Life, LLC. (Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/12 3:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Trouble Livin Life, LLC, Laveranues Coles.(Katzman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order to show cause Mon 06/10 4:45 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE on or before June 17, 2024, as to why this case should not be dismissed for want of subject-matter jurisdiction.Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/10/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 06/10 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Mon 06/10 4:32 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/10/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Fri 06/07 3:10 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Konicek & Dillon, P.C., Amir Tahmassebi. (AJS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 06/07 12:08 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steven Mark Katzman and Charles J. Bennardini, II of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/07 12:07 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:24-cv-575-WWB-MCR. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22173271) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bennardini, Charles) Modified on 6/7/2024 to edit docket text (AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons- Konicek & Dillon, P.C.,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons- Amir Tahmassebi, Esq.