Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 5:24-cv-02477
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:06 AM EST
Defendant
EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
1801 BUSHKILL DRIVE
EASTON, PA 18040
Represented By
JOHN E. FREUND, III
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Shorav Kaushik
King Spry
contact info
Plaintiff
MELANIE WILSON
37-4 CRANBERRY RIDGE
READING, PA 19606
Represented By
ERIKA A. FARKAS
Broughal & Devito LLP
contact info
JOHN S. HARRISON
Broughal & Devito, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 05/12 1:48 PM
ORDER OF 5/12/25 THAT THE COURT HAVING RECEIVED A LETTER REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS TREATED AS A MOTION, AND THE MOTION IS GRANTED. FURTHER, AFTER HAVING BEEN REPORTED THAT THE ISSUES AMONG THE PARTIES IN THE ABOVE ACITON HAVE BEEN SETTLED AND UPON ORDER OF THE COURT PURSUANT TO 41.1(b) OF THE LRCP IT IS ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITHOUT COSTS, PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 5/12/25. 5/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Dismiss Mon 05/12 1:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss..(dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 04/10 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW Settlement Conference held on 4/10/25. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/31 3:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND FACT-DISCOVERY DEADLINE, IS GRANTED AND THE FACT-DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 4/30/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 1/31/25.1/31/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/30 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /to Extend February 28, 2025 Fact-Discovery Deadline filed by MELANIE WILSON, EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT..(HARRISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Cancelling Deadline Tue 01/14 3:22 PM
ORDER OF 1/14/25 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE CASE BEING REASSIGNED TO DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 14, 205 BEFORE JUDGE SCHMEHL IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/14/25. 1/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/10 1:21 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL TO DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/10/25. 1/10/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 12/10 12:04 PM
ORDER OF 12/6/24 THAT AFTER HOLDING A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE FACT-DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 28, 2025; AND THE COURT WILL HOLD AN IN-PERSON STATUS/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON MARCH 14, 2025, AT 10:00AM IN THE COURTROOM OF THE UNDERSIGNED WHICH IS LOCATED AT THE GATEWAY BUILDING, 201 PENN STREET, 5TH FLOOR, READING, PA., 19601. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/6/24. 12/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
17 17 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 12/06 4:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Telephone Conference held on 12/6/24. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/25 3:51 PM
ORDER OF 11/25/24 THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON DECEMBER 6, 2024 AT 10:30AM. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A TELECONFERENCE DIAL IN NUMBER AND CODE TO ALL PARTIES 3 BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE AND EMAIL THE SAME TO CHAMBERS EMAIL: Chambers_of_Judge_Jeffrey_L_Schmehl@paed.uscourts.gov. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/25/24. 11/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/21 3:32 PM
AMENDED CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/10/25 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3G; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 11/21/24. 11/21/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Wed 11/20 10:52 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENE IS BEING TREATED AS A MOTION 13 . THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 11/20/24.11/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Order Wed 11/20 10:51 AM
MOTION TO RESCHEDULE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/19 4:43 PM
ORDER THAT 1. THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY BY FEBRUARY 14, 2025; AND 2. A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON DECEMBER 6, 2024, AT 10:30, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/19/24. 9/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/19 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. A Rule 16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference was held via Telephone on September 19, 2024, Not on the Record. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/12 10:00 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/26/2024 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 8/12/24. 8/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 11:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELANIE WILSON. EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 6/7/2024, answer due 8/6/2024. (HARRISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/06 12:20 PM
ORDER OF 8/6/24 THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HLED ON THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 6, 2024 AT 10:30AM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/6/24. 8/6/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Tue 08/06 12:18 PM
ORDER OF 8/6/24 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: CRAIG M. STRAW FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/6/24. 8/6/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/05 2:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT.(Kaushik, Shorav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shorav Kaushik on behalf of EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(Kaushik, Shorav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. FREUND, III on behalf of EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (FREUND, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/07 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA A. FARKAS on behalf of MELANIE WILSON (FARKAS, ERIKA)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 06/07 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/7/24 (mas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 06/07 9:15 AM
COMPLAINT against EASTON AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17522875.), filed by MELANIE WILSON.(HARRISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Designation Form Case Management Track Designation Form