Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:24-cv-00679
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:17 AM EST
Cross Claimant
City of Dover, Police Academy
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Delaware River and Bay Authority
Represented By
Michael P. Stafford
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Willie Johnson
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
City of Dover, Police Academy
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Delaware River and Bay Authority
Represented By
Michael P. Stafford
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Willie Johnson
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Defendant
City of Dover, Police Academy
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Defendant
Delaware River and Bay Authority
Represented By
Michael P. Stafford
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Willie Johnson
Represented By
Daniel A. Griffith
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen L. Pierce
Represented By
Timothy S. Seiler
contact info
John M. LaRosa
Larosa & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
42 42 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 05/09 8:58 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of PFC Max Alderson on May 20, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
41 41 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 05/09 8:56 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corporal Anthony Smith on May 20, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
40 40 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 05/01 3:19 PM
ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised chambers that they have reached an agreement on the dispute that was scheduled to be heard on 5/5/2025. In light of the agreement the conference for 5/5/2025, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/28 2:44 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen L. Pierce on May 28, 2025 at 10:00 am filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
38 38 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 04/25 3:48 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery Deadline - filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority. (Stafford, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/25 10:31 AM
ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 5/5/2025, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Further, the party filing the opening dispute letter shall also attach a proposed order for the relief they are seeking. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 4:46 PM
SO ORDERED, re38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery Deadline (*Resetting Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/30/2025). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
36 36 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/24 2:34 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of PFC Max Alderson on 4/30/2025 filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
35 35 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/24 2:33 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corporal Anthony Smith on 4/30/2025 filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/21 2:00 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Colonel Wayne E. McFadden on 4/24/2025 filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
33 33 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/21 1:58 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of PFC Max Alderson on 4/23/2025 filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/21 1:55 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Master Corporal Willie Johnson on 4/22/2025 filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
31 31 discov Notice of Service Fri 04/11 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant DRBA's Production Documents (Bates Nos. DRBA001103 - DRBA001146) - served on April 4, 2025 filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 04/07 4:49 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen L. Pierce on April 28, 2025 at 9:00 am filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
29 29 discov Notice of Service Thu 03/20 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant DRBA's Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 discov Notice of Service Thu 03/13 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental responses to Defendant City of Dover, Police Academy and Willie Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories and well as Plaintiff's Supplemental responses to Defendant Delaware River and Bay Authority's First Set of Interrogatories re18 Notice of Service,25 Notice of Service filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 discov Notice of Service Fri 01/24 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental responses to Defendant City of Dover, Police Academy and Willie Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories re25 Notice of Service filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 discov Notice of Service Thu 01/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs responses to Defendant Delaware River and Bay Authoritys First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents re25 Notice of Service filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
25 25 discov Notice of Service Mon 12/02 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Delaware River and Bay Authority's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
24 24 discov Notice of Service Fri 11/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant City of Dover, Police Academy and Willie Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents, filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John) Modified on 11/22/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice of Service Fri 11/22 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Delaware River and Bay Authority and Willie Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents, filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John) Modified on 11/22/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
22 22 discov Notice of Service Fri 11/15 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant DRBA's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Defendant DRBA's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, and Defendant DRBA's Production Documents (Bates Nos. DRBA000001 DRBA001102) filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 10 pgs order Order Mon 10/07 4:13 PM
SO ORDERED Granting19 Confidentiality Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 10/07 2:10 PM
ANSWER to10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , Counter CROSSCLAIM against City of Dover, Police Academy, Willie Johnson by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 10/07 11:34 AM
Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order, by Delaware River and Bay Authority. (Stafford, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 discov Notice of Service Tue 10/01 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants City of Dover Police Academy and Willie Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff filed by City of Dover, Police Academy, Willie Johnson.(Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
17 17 discov Notice of Service Wed 09/25 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures on Behalf of Defendants, City of Dover and Willie Johnson filed by City of Dover, Police Academy, Willie Johnson.(Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Notice of Service Wed 09/25 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents, filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(LaRosa, John) Modified on 9/25/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 discov Notice of Service Tue 09/24 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant DRBA's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 order Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 09/19 2:33 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference set for 10/8/2024, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order - General Thu 09/19 2:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2024. Fact Discovery completed by 5/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2025. A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/7/2025, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3-day Jury Trial is set to start 11/17/2025, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Wed 09/18 5:04 PM
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Michael P. Stafford, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
11 11 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Wed 09/18 9:40 AM
Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/8/2024, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 09/16 4:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Delaware River and Bay Authority by City of Dover, Police Academy, Willie Johnson.(Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/09 3:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Delaware River and Bay Authority.(Stafford, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 07/30 9:58 AM
Reset Answer Deadlines: (nms)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Tue 07/30 10:01 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed waivers filed at D.I. 7 and D.I. 8 on 7/29/2024, have been removed from the docket as incorrect service dates were used to calculate the answer due date. Counsel indicated the 60-day clock started on 7/22/2024, but upon review of the waiver the filings indicate the clock starts on 7/18/2024. Counsel is to refile the waivers and use the correct date the waiver was sent 7/18/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Mon 07/29 12:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Stephen L. Pierce: For Willie Johnson waiver sent on 7/18/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Mon 07/29 12:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Stephen L. Pierce: For City of Dover, Police Academy waiver sent on 7/18/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Thu 06/20 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Stephen L. Pierce: For Delaware River and Bay Authority waiver sent on 6/13/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 06/20 10:13 AM
SO ORDERED, re4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy S. Seiler, filed by Stephen L. Pierce. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 06/20 10:54 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy S. Seiler for Stephen L. Pierce added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
5 5 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 06/19 2:40 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Timothy S. Seiler. ( re4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy S. Seiler )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4433510).(LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/19 2:38 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy S. Seiler - filed by Stephen L. Pierce. (LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/12 11:17 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 06/07 1:05 PM
DECLARATION re1 Complaint, OF JOSHUA B. CARTER by Stephen L. Pierce. (LaRosa, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 06/07 12:51 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against City of Dover, Police Academy, Delaware River and Bay Authority, Willie Johnson ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4425123.) - filed by Stephen L. Pierce.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Fri 06/07 12:51 PM
No Summons Issued. (apk)
Related: [-]