Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:24-cv-00085
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
TOWNE PROPERTIES ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LTD
Represented By
ROBERT E SICKLES
contact info
BRIAN BOYD
contact info
MATTHEW J BAKOTA
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
LUMACORP INC
Represented By
PATRICIA ANNE GORHAM
Eversheds Sutherland (us) LLP
contact info
CHARLES D LEE
contact info
KAITLIN ANN CARRENO
contact info
MYNDEE M LEE
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
MANCO ABBOTT INC
Represented By
JESSICA NELSON
contact info
SHELBY B MENARD
contact info
DONALD G HEEMAN
contact info
KURT M ROZELSKY
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
MCWHINNEY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By
CYNTHIA G BURNSIDE
contact info
DAVID KULLY
contact info
KENNETH L RACOWSKI
One Liberty Place
contact info
SARA BENSON
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
MORGUARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC
Represented By
TAYLOR JASZEWSKI
contact info
JOSHUA A MAYES
contact info
MATTHEW T PARRISH
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
HEIDI B BRADLEY
contact info
Defendant
PRG REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By
PAUL OLSZOWKA
contact info
ERIC S FISHER
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
ADDISON SMITH
contact info
Defendant
RAM PARTNERS LLC
Represented By
CAMERON N REGNERY
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
RD MERRILL REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By
JOHN C AMABILE
contact info
CHRISTOPHER M WYANT
contact info
DEREK SUTTON
contact info
SHAYLA J WRIGHT
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
contact info
Defendant
SINGH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LTD
Represented By
JAMES MICHAEL BURNS
contact info
KILLIAN WYATT
contact info
RICHARD MATTHEWS
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
SUMMIT MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Represented By
ANDREW DALE RANDOL
contact info
CHAD A SHULTZ
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
10 FEDERAL MGMT LLC
Represented By
JAMES MICHAEL BURNS
contact info
KILLIAN WYATT
contact info
LAURA DENISE WINDSOR
contact info
RICHARD MATTHEWS
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
TRIBRIDGE RESIDENTIAL LLC
Represented By
PETER L MUNK
contact info
JEFFREY L MAPEN
contact info
ANNEFLOOR JOSEPHINE DE GROOT
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
YARDI SYSTEMS INC
Represented By
ADAM C SAUNDERS
contact info
ALAN G SNIPES
contact info
ABRAHAM TABAIE
contact info
KRISTIN D KIEHN
contact info
THOMAS F GRISTINA
contact info
WILLIAM DAVID SARRATT
contact info
MICHAEL SCHAPER
contact info
MAURA KATHLEEN MONAGHAN
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
A J DWOSKIN & ASSOCIATES INC
Defendant
CONTINENTAL REALTY CORPORATION
Defendant
EDWARD ROSE & SONS
Defendant
ENVOLVE COMMUNITIES LLC
Defendant
GUARDIAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES LLC
Defendant
KRE GROUP INC
Represented By
ROBERT R LOMAX
contact info
MICHAEL ANTHONY CEDRONE
contact info
JOSEPH WOLFSON
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
ALCO MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By
KATHERINE FUNK
contact info
STEVEN R PRESS
contact info
TYLER P BISHOP
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
ARDMORE RESIDENTIAL INC
Represented By
KEVIN L WARD
contact info
MICHAEL J ALLEN
contact info
James Zachary Zimmerman
contact info
ROBERT YOUNG
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
BALACIANO GROUP
Represented By
MICHAEL B SCOTT
contact info
C MORRIS MULLIN
contact info
J BENJAMIN FINLEY
contact info
DAVID R HELMICK
contact info
N NICKOLAS JACKSON
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
BALKE BROWN TRANSWESTERN INC
Represented By
SCOTT ERIC ANDERSON
contact info
GEORGE B GREEN, JR
contact info
CAMERON N REGNERY
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
BANYAN REALTY PARTNERS LLC
Represented By
JAMES MICHAEL BURNS
contact info
KILLIAN WYATT
contact info
LAURA DENISE WINDSOR
contact info
RICHARD MATTHEWS
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
BEZTAK MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By
JAMES MICHAEL BURNS
contact info
KILLIAN WYATT
contact info
RICHARD MATTHEWS
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
BRIDGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LC
Represented By
DYLAN BALLARD
contact info
MICHAEL SCARBOROUGH
contact info
LAWRENCE S WINSOR
contact info
STEPHEN M MEDLOCK
contact info
MADISON LO
contact info
MICHAEL KEVIN COSTELLO
contact info
MACKENZIE GREY NEWMAN
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
CALIBRATE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By
BRIAN J SUTHERLAND
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
CREEKWOOD PROPERTY CORPORATION
Represented By
MICHAEL ALAN SWARTZENDRUBER
contact info
JESSICA ARNOLD CALEB
contact info
T BRANDON WADDELL
contact info
ELIOT FIELDING TURNER
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
DALTON MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By
JONATHAN ALAN PORTER
contact info
JONATHAN P HARLAN
contact info
BRIAN EPLEY
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN DOES 1-100
Represented By
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
FPI MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By
BARA AHMAD
contact info
CHARLES HOWARD SAMEL
contact info
JENNA M POLIGO
contact info
GEORGE ANTHONY GUTHRIE
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
GRUBB PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By
CYNTHIA G BURNSIDE
contact info
DAVID KULLY
contact info
KENNETH L RACOWSKI
One Liberty Place
contact info
SARA BENSON
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
HNN ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By
ELVIRA CASTILLO
contact info
TIFFANY L LEE
contact info
BRANNON J ARNOLD
contact info
MARTEN N KING
contact info
NICHOLAS P PANAYOTOPOULOS
contact info
DAVID A PEREZ
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Movant
MCKENNA DUFFY
Represented By
RIO PIERCE
contact info
JOSEPH ALAN KAISER
One Sugarloaf Ctr
contact info
Movant
BRETT MICHAEL
Represented By
RIO PIERCE
contact info
JOSEPH ALAN KAISER
One Sugarloaf Ctr
contact info
Plaintiff
MADISON SHEWMAKER
Represented By
CHARLES W BEENE
contact info
PAUL W EVANS
contact info
JESSICA M HAYNES
contact info
LAUREN ELIZABETH MILES
contact info
WILSON DANIEL MILES, III
contact info
REBECCA D GILLILAND
contact info
MICHAEL SLOCUMB
contact info
ALISON D HAWTHORNE
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMAAR FAISON
Represented By
CHARLES W BEENE
contact info
PAUL W EVANS
contact info
JESSICA M HAYNES
contact info
LAUREN ELIZABETH MILES
contact info
WILSON DANIEL MILES, III
contact info
REBECCA D GILLILAND
contact info
MICHAEL SLOCUMB
contact info
ALISON D HAWTHORNE
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Beevers
Represented By
PAUL W EVANS
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
WESTDALE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD LP
Terminated: 09/03/2024
Represented By
LEAH SCHULTZ
contact info
PATRICK B SHAW
contact info
C SCOTT LENT
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info
Defendant
LEFEVER MATTSON
Terminated: 10/10/2024
Represented By
COLIN KAMRATH KELLY
contact info
ADRIANNA SIMONELLI
contact info

GPO Jul 01 2024
ORDER granting 39 Motion motion filing and briefing deadline. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 7/1/2024 (tlf).
GPO Aug 26 2024
ORDER setting schedule and scope for jurisdictional discovery. Jurisdictional discovery shall be complete by October 15, 2024. The briefing schedule previously set for Rule 12 motions remains unchanged (Motions due by September 10, 2024; Responses due by October 25, 2024; Replies due by November 25, 2024). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 08/26/2024. (CCL)

Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility REMARK Tue 11/19 8:05 AM
REMARK : In light of285 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
285 285 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/18 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JAMAAR FAISON, MADISON SHEWMAKER, Cynthia Beevers as to All Defendants (EVANS, PAUL)
Related: [-]