Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00602
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:58 AM EST
defendant
Leif Haugen
Represented By
Bradley K. Glazier
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
John D. Fitzpatrick
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (holland)
contact info
defendant
Derek Ledy
Represented By
Bradley K. Glazier
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
John D. Fitzpatrick
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (holland)
contact info
defendant
Jason Zeeff
Represented By
Bradley K. Glazier
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
John D. Fitzpatrick
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (holland)
contact info
defendant
Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC
Represented By
Bradley K. Glazier
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
John D. Fitzpatrick
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (holland)
contact info
plaintiff
Dri-Design, Inc.
Represented By
J. Michael Huget
Honigman Llp (gr)
contact info
Peter G. Callaghan
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios, Llp (nh)
contact info
Patrick Larry Rawsthorne
Honigman Llp (gr)
contact info
Kat J. Mail
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios, Llp (nh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
49 49 1 pgs misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright Tue 09/03 9:41 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Order of Dismissal,
Att: 2 46 pgs Complaint
48 48 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 09/03 8:59 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting proposed stipulated order47 ; Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and without costs; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
47 47 2 pgs motion Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/30 12:17 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. (Callaghan, Peter)
Related: [-]
46 46 2 pgs motion Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/30 8:49 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. (Callaghan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
45 45 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Thu 08/29 8:27 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 9/12/2024; cancelling 9/3/2024 evidentiary hearing; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
44 44 1 pgs notice Notice Rescheduling Motion Hearing Tue 08/27 12:31 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING regarding motion14 that was previously set for 9/3/2024 at 10:00 AM; motion hearing is set for 9/3/2024 at 09:00 AM (change in time only) at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; (lep)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 12:27 PM
ORDER regarding motion14 : setting revised hearing schedule; notice to issue; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 08/26 12:16 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice STIPULATION41 regarding confidentiality terms; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Fri 08/23 7:58 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER41 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
41 41 12 pgs motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 08/21 5:51 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER regarding confidentiality terms by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/22/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
40 40 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/21 5:35 PM
JOINT NOTICE Indicating Expected Duration of Presentations of Evidence by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/22/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
39 39 14 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/19 3:21 PM
REPLY to response to motion14 filed by Dri-Design, Inc. (Callaghan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
38 38 13 pgs motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/13 11:56 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim in Counts 5 (conversion) and 6 (tortious interference) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC; (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
37 37 53 pgs respm Response in Opposition Tue 08/13 5:23 PM
CORRECTED RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction and Request for Oral Argument 14 (Corrected with Tables of Content and Authorities) filed by Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/14/2024; this entry replaces28 through35 (ems).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Jason Zeeff Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Derek Ledy Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Leif Haugen Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Employee Handbook,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Bill Shnowske Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - New Drawings Comparison,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - letter to opposing counsel
36 36 20 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 5:05 PM
ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses (as to Counts 1-4) by Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
35 35 4 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:45 AM
EXHIBIT H re28 (letter from counsel) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
34 34 5 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:44 AM
EXHIBIT F re28 (Installation Detail Drawings) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
33 33 7 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:42 AM
EXHIBIT E re28 (Shnowske Declaration) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
32 32 6 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:41 AM
EXHIBIT D re28 (Handbook excerpts) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
31 31 3 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:40 AM
EXHIBIT C re28 (Haugen Declaration) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:38 AM
EXHIBIT B re28 (Derek Ledy Declaration) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
29 29 113 pgs misc Exhibit Tue 08/13 1:37 AM
EXHIBIT A re28 (Jason Zeeff Declaration) by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
28 28 49 pgs respm Response in Opposition Mon 08/12 11:59 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction and Request for Oral Argument 14 (exhibits to folllow) filed by Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 08/08 10:49 AM
ORDER denying emergency motion for discovery21 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs misc Notify Attorney Notice Thu 08/08 8:44 AM
NOTICE to attorney Kat J. Mail regarding recent filing25 (ems)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
25 25 10 pgs respm Response in Opposition Wed 08/07 6:07 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION for discovery for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery and to Reschedule the September 3, 2024 Hearing 21 filed by Dri-Design, Inc. (Mail, Kat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Tue 08/06 12:52 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's response to motion21 due not later than 8/7/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs misc Notify Attorney Notice Tue 08/06 9:10 AM
NOTICE to attorney Bradley K. Glazier regarding recent filing21 (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Mon 08/05 4:42 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION for discovery for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery and to Reschedule the September 3, 2024 Hearing 21 filed by Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
21 21 motion Discovery Mon 08/05 4:40 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for discovery for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery and to Reschedule the September 3, 2024 Hearing by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC; (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, August 04, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence Sun 08/04 6:06 PM
ORDER regarding motion for leave to conduct expedited discovery and to rescheduled hearing19 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
19 19 12 pgs motion Discovery Fri 08/02 4:34 PM
MOTION for discovery (leave to take expedited discovery and reschedule briefing and hearing by defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 07/31 1:28 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter G. Callaghan on behalf of plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. (Callaghan, Peter)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 07/31 1:41 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kat J. Mail on behalf of plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. (Mail, Kat)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing Fri 07/26 2:10 PM
ORDER regarding motion14 ; setting briefing schedule and other deadlines; evidentiary hearing set for 9/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Fri 07/26 9:58 AM
ORDER granting to an extent unopposed motion for leave to file under seal12 ; the proposed memorandum of law and declaration13 shall be filed under restricted access; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
16 16 1 pgs notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/25 4:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
15 15 34 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of a Motion Thu 07/25 3:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction14 filed by Dri-Design, Inc. (Huget, J.) Modified text on 7/26/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Declaration Fowler,
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration Beaudoin,
Att: 3 1 pgs Declaration Callaghan,
Att: 4 14 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 7 9 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 9 9 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit G
14 14 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 07/25 3:10 PM
MOTION for preliminary injunction and Request for Oral Argument by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc.; (Huget, J.)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Sealed Document Thu 07/25 2:47 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT of Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. re UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT 12 (Huget, J.) [Access to this document is available to the Court and counsel of record for the parties only] Modified text on 7/25/2024 (ems). Modified text and access per Order17 on 7/26/2024 (ems).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
12 12 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Thu 07/25 2:30 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc.; (Huget, J.)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/25 9:25 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John D. Fitzpatrick on behalf of defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/25 9:36 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley K. Glazier on behalf of defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/19 12:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Leif Haugen as to Leif Haugen waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024 [Attorney Bradley K. Glazier added to party Leif Haugen(pty:dft)] (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/19 12:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Zeeff as to Jason Zeeff waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024 [Attorney Bradley K. Glazier added to party Jason Zeeff(pty:dft)] (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/19 12:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Derek Ledy as to Derek Ledy waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024 [Attorney Bradley K. Glazier added to party Derek Ledy(pty:dft)] (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/19 11:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC as to Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024 [Attorney Bradley K. Glazier added to party Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC(pty:dft)] (Glazier, Bradley)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 06/19 4:23 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John D. Fitzpatrick on behalf of defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 1 pgs notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/18 1:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dri-Design, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kingspan Holdings US Inc., Corporate Parent Kingspan Investments Ltd., Corporate Parent Kingspan Group Limited for Dri-Design, Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 9:27 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/10 9:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Fri 06/07 4:02 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Huget, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright Fri 06/07 2:53 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 06/07 2:47 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC filed by Dri-Design, Inc. (Huget, J.) Modified text on 6/7/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 06/07 11:50 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7396213 (Huget, J.)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 06/07 12:00 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Larry Rawsthorne on behalf of plaintiff Dri-Design, Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Fri 06/07 2:49 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Leif Haugen, Derek Ledy, Jason Zeeff, Zeeff Panel Systems, LLC (proposed summonses have not been provided by filing party) (ems)
Related: [-]