Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:24-bk-04587
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jul 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Midas Gold Group, LLC, Debtor
625 W Deer Valley Rd Ste 109
Phoenix, AZ 85027-2140
Represented By
ALAN A. MEDA
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003
Represented By
PATTY CHAN
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2024 5:00 PM MST
Friday, June 07, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Fri 06/07 11:02 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-04587] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36597948. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Fri 06/07 11:01 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 06/28/2024, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/5/2024. filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Fri 06/07 11:04 AM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 09:45 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Approve (Motion to) Fri 06/07 11:15 AM
Emergency Motion to Approve EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS UNDER 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 345 AND 363 AUTHORIZING (A) MAINTENANCE AND USE OF DEBTORS EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM; AND (B) ALLOWING DEBTOR TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Wage Order (Motion for) Fri 06/07 11:21 AM
Emergency Motion for Wage Order EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM AND FINAL ORDER AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND OTHER COMPENSATION filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance (Notice of) Fri 06/07 11:44 AM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by PATTY CHAN of OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(CHAN, PATTY)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Approve (Motion to) Fri 06/07 11:47 AM
Emergency Motion to Approve EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF PREPETITION UTILITIES filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Fri 06/07 11:48 AM
Application to Employ BANKRUPTCY COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 other Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 Fri 06/07 11:51 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. Related [+] (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ
9 9 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Fri 06/07 11:52 AM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 other Declaration Fri 06/07 11:58 AM
Declaration OF JAMES CLARK IN SUPPORT OF DEBTORS FIRST DAY MOTIONS filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 order oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form) Fri 06/07 12:42 PM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 6/7/2024 Hearing set for 7/9/2024 at 11:00 AM as a Videoconference Hearing Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 6/25/2024 . (RSB)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Emergency/Expedited Hearing (Notice of) Fri 06/07 1:48 PM
Notice of Emergency/Expedited Hearing filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Midas Gold Group, LLC Related [+] Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 6/10/2024 at 02:30 PM at 230 N First Ave, Crtrm 603, Phoenix, AZ (DPC).(MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Approve,4 Motion for Wage Order,6 Motion to Approve,7 Application to Employ,9 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions
13 13 3 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Fri 06/07 2:38 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee (Christopher Simpson) . filed by PATTY CHAN of OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(CHAN, PATTY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A - Simpson Verified Stmt
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 06/09 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference