Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-41357
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Oct 11, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lone Star Logistics and Delivery, LLC
5211 Spanish Oaks
Frisco, TX 75034-5107
Represented By
Michael S. Mitchell
Michael S. Mitchell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 02/24 1:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
72 72 order Final Decree Fri 02/21 12:31 PM
Final Decree Closing Case Of Lone Star Logistics And Delivery, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] 71 Application for Final Decree Filed by Lone Star Logistics and Delivery, LLC (wg