Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarah F Russell
Referred: Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:24-cv-01009
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
Gartner, Inc
Represented By
Daniel Adam Schwartz
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Keegan A. Drenosky
Shipman & Goodwin - Stmfd
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Malkani
Represented By
Mark Paul Carey
Carey & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Christopher S. Avcollie
Carey & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
46 46 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Balding on behalf of Robert Malkani (Balding, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
45 45 misc Transcript Tue 02/18 2:35 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on November 1, 2024 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/11/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025. (Huntington, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
44 44 8 pgs respm Response Tue 01/21 2:10 PM
RESPONSE re43 Notice of Additional Authority (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority) filed by Gartner, Inc. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
43 43 4 pgs respm Notice of Additional Authority Thu 01/09 2:23 PM
Notice of Additional Authority re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Malkani. (Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
42 42 order Order of Transfer Tue 01/07 9:42 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah F. Russell for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2025.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
41 41 4 pgs respm Response Fri 11/15 10:54 PM
RESPONSE re36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Letter Brief re Retaliation Claims filed by Gartner, Inc. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
40 40 7 pgs respm Response Fri 11/15 4:36 PM
RESPONSE re37 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Letter Brief re Judicial Notice & Additional Cases filed by Gartner, Inc.(Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
39 39 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/15 2:30 PM
Memorandum in Opposition Response to Defendant's Letter Brief re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Malkani. (Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
38 38 10 pgs respm Response Fri 11/08 4:49 PM
RESPONSE re 33 Order,,,, for Supplemental Letter Brief filed by Gartner, Inc.(Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
37 37 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/08 4:00 PM
Memorandum in Opposition Second Supplemental Letter Brief re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Malkani.(Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
36 36 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/08 3:55 PM
Memorandum in Opposition Supplemental Letter Brief re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Malkani. (Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
35 35 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 11/06 3:05 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Oral Argument held on 11/1/2024 taking under advisement17 Motion to Dismiss. 47 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order Fri 11/01 1:31 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER SUBMISSION ORDER FOR LIST OF CASES NOT PREVIOUSLY CITED AND JUDICIALLY NOTICEABLE FACTS. In accordance with the Court's colloquy with counsel at oral argument today, each party may file a letter to Judge Meyer with a list of any cases not previously cited by the party and/or any facts that the party believes is subject to judicial notice. For each case listed, a party should include a short statement explaining why such case is relevant and significant to the party's position in this case. For each judicially noticeable fact, a party should include a short statement explaining why such fact meets the requirements for judicial notice pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 201 and why such fact is relevant and significant to the party's position in this case. Each party shall file their letters not to exceed 5 single-space pages by November 8, 2024 , and each party may file any response to the opposing party's letter not to exceed 5 single-space pages by November 15, 2024 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/01/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.) Modified on 11/1/2024 (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order Fri 11/01 1:27 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER BRIEFING ORDER. In accordance with the Court's colloquy with counsel at oral argument today, the parties shall file supplemental letter briefs on the following two issues: ? Whether as a matter of law a claim of retaliation for engaging in protected activity of complaining about a sexually hostile work environment qualifies as a "sexual harassment dispute" within the scope of the Ending Forced Arbitration of Sexual Assault and Sexual Harassment Act of 2021, 9 U.S.C. §§ 401-02, and ? Whether Counts Eight and Nine of the complaint allege enough facts to state plausible grounds for relief as to a claim for retaliation against protected activity of complaining about a sexually hostile work environment? Each party shall file their letter briefs not to exceed 10 single-space pages by November 8, 2024 , and to file any response to the opposing partys letter brief not to exceed 5 single-space pages by November 15, 2024 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/01/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
32 32 notice Notice Wed 10/02 4:30 PM
NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. The Court advises the parties that it expects that the oral argument on the defendants' motion to dismiss at 8:30am on November 1, 2024 will be attended for educational purposes by a first-year civil procedure class from Yale Law School. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2024.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/27 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response to17 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Gartner, Inc. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 09/18 12:15 PM
ORDER granting28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in further Support as to17 MOTION to Dismiss until September 27, 2024,17 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/27/2024. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/18/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
29 29 utility Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing Tue 09/17 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR re:17 MOTION to Dismiss . THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral Argument Hearing set for 11/1/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 09/12 4:09 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in further Support as to17 MOTION to Dismiss until September 27, 2024 by Gartner, Inc. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/11 7:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY (Doc. #23 ). Because plaintiff has not timely filed any objection or other response, the Court GRANTS the motion to stay discovery until the Court's determination of the pending partial motion to dismiss and to compel arbitration (Doc. #17 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/11/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/06 10:34 AM
ORDER granting24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until two weeks following the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery to Comply with the Initial Discovery Protocols16 Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/6/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
25 25 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/05 4:26 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Malkani.(Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit A
Thursday, August 29, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/29 10:43 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until two weeks following the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery to Comply with the Initial Discovery Protocols16 Order by Gartner, Inc. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
23 23 motion Stay Mon 08/19 4:33 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by Gartner, Inc.Responses due by 9/9/2024(Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Keegan A. Drenosky in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Mon 08/19 11:18 AM
ORDER granting21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss until September 6, 2024. Responses due by 9/6/2024. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/19/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 08/15 10:43 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss until September 6, 2024 by Robert Malkani. (Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/15 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Avcollie on behalf of Robert Malkani (Avcollie, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
19 19 order Order Mon 08/12 2:44 PM
ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) report and shall abstain for now from entering a scheduling order pending consideration of defendant's motion to stay discovery. The defendant shall file any such motion on or before August 19, 2024 , and plaintiff may file any objection or other response on or before August 26, 2024 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/12/2024.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 08/09 5:01 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss Fri 08/02 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Gartner, Inc.Responses due by 8/23/2024(Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 27 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order Fri 07/19 3:04 PM
INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/19/2024.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/19 3:07 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/9/2024 (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/02 2:44 PM
ORDER granting14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2024 to respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/2/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 07/02 2:45 PM
Answer deadline updated for Gartner, Inc to 8/2/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/26 3:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2024 to respond to Complaint1 Complaint by Gartner, Inc. (Schwartz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 06/26 3:15 PM
Disclosure Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by Gartner, Inc. (Schwartz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keegan A. Drenosky on behalf of Gartner, Inc (Drenosky, Keegan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Adam Schwartz on behalf of Gartner, Inc (Schwartz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/20 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Malkani. Gartner, Inc served on 6/12/2024, answer due 7/3/2024. (Carey, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 06/10 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gartner, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Paul Carey* *Carey & Associates, P.C.* *71 Old Post Rd, Suite One* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 06/10 1:35 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,5 Standing Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,7 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols,4 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by Robert Malkani Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 intord Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols Mon 06/10 1:33 PM
Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 06/10 1:32 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 06/10 1:31 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 06/10 1:24 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 06/10 1:24 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2024 Discovery due by 12/7/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2025 Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 06/10 9:42 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2024.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 78 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Gartner, Inc ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7794346.), filed by Robert Malkani.(Carey, Mark)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 06/07 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Gartner, Inc. (Carey, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/10 10:41 AM
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]