Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 6:24-cv-01097
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:32 AM CST
Defendant
Rena Bitter
Represented By
Russell J. Keller
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Russell J. Keller
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Russell J. Keller
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Saadia Ali Noor
Represented By
Bradford McGann
Covington & Burling Llp - Dc
contact info
Alice J. Ahn
Covington & Burling Llp - Ca
contact info
Rebecca McMahon
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Ellen Choi
Covington & Burling Llp - Ca
contact info
Nitin Subhedar
Covington & Burling Llp - Ca
contact info
Austin L. Plier
Covington & Burling Llp - Dc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 06, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/06 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Saadia Ali Noor (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/07 3:19 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 11/20 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Bradford McGann as to Saadia Ali Noor (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 11/20 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Nitin Sabhedar as to Saadia Ali Noor (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGED CONFERENCE CALL NUMBER FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES AND HEARINGS WITH JUDGE SCHWARTZ. Judge Schwartz's conference call number has changed. From this date going forward, please use only 785-337-8299, Conference ID 673 598 390, for all telephonic conferences and hearings with Judge Schwartz. Previous orders may have directed the parties to call 888-363-4749 for conferences and hearings. From this date, do NOT call 888-363-4749 for any conferences or hearings with Judge Schwartz. (drk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/08 12:02 PM
ORDER granting25 Second Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. The Court grants the Motion for good cause shown and resets the scheduling conference for January 29, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. by phone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809). On or before January 13, 2025, the parties must submit to the Magistrate Judge's chambers a copy of their proposed scheduling order, a redline version, and copies of their initial disclosures. Defendants must respond to the complaint on or before January 8, 2025. Because the Court is granting lengthy extensions, the parties are put on notice that future extensions are unlikely, and they must plan accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/8/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/07 4:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney) , Joint MOTION for extension of time to extend case deadlines ( Response deadline 10/21/2024) by Defendants Rena Bitter, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas Related [+] (Keller, Russell)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Friday, August 23, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/23 10:31 AM
ORDER granting23 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines in Initial Order. The Court grants the Motion for good cause shown and resets the scheduling conference for October 29, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. by phone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809). On or before October 15, 2024, the parties must submit to the Magistrate Judge's chambers a copy of their proposed scheduling order, a redline version, and copies of their initial disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 8/23/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/22 5:09 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time for deadlines in Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling by Defendants Rena Bitter, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas Related [+] (Keller, Russell)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/21 4:42 PM
ORDER granting21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. The Court grants the Motion as unopposed and for good cause shown and extends the deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint up to and including October 10, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 8/21/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/21 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Rena Bitter, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas Related [+] (Keller, Russell)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Friday, August 09, 2024
20 20 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Fri 08/09 10:11 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for September 11, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/21/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/30/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on August 9, 2024. (drk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Wed 08/07 1:14 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/26/2024 for Defendants Rena Bitter, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/06/2024. (jk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
18 18 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Mon 07/22 4:54 PM
Kate E. Brubacher Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/12/2024 All Defendants. Summons served on United States Attorney. (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Mon 07/22 4:49 PM
Merrick B. Garland Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/17/2024 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Mon 07/22 4:47 PM
Rena Bitter Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/17/2024 (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Mon 07/22 4:46 PM
Alejandro Mayorkas Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 7/2/2024 (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Mon 07/22 4:44 PM
UR M. Jaddou Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 6/25/2024 (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 9:26 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nitin Subhedar for Saadia Ali Noor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 9:25 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Choi for Saadia Ali Noor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 9:24 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradford McGann for Saadia Ali Noor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 9:23 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Austin L. Plier for Saadia Ali Noor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 9:21 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alice J. Ahn for Saadia Ali Noor pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 06/10 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Rena Bitter, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint.. (sz)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:30 PM
MOTION for attorney Nitin Subhedar to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372746.) by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor Related [+](McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:29 PM
MOTION for attorney Ellen Choi to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372734.) by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor Related [+](McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:26 PM
MOTION for attorney Bradford McGann to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372728.) by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor Related [+](McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:24 PM
MOTION for attorney Austin Plier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372723.) by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor Related [+](McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:22 PM
MOTION for attorney Alice Ahn to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372656.) by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor Related [+](McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Fri 06/07 3:09 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor - trial to be held in Wichita. (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/07 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Saadia Ali Noor. (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 06/07 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6372616.), filed by Saadia Ali Noor. (McMahon, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 06/07 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (mam)
Related: [-]