Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Papillon Equipment Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04101 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Eric Akopyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Eugene Kogan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lament Supply Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Papillon Equipment Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dean Ruchir Sardjoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 11/5/2024 ) (RG) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Papillon Equipment Inc., Lament Supply Group Inc., Eugene Kogan, Eric Akopyan, and Dean Ruchir Sardjoe by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company (Levy, Barry) |
|
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined
Tue 10/29 10:14 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (SGC) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 10/29 10:28 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Magistrate Judge James R. Cho no longer assigned as presider to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (MS) |
||
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 10/09 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties report this matter has settled. Accordingly, a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter is due by 11/8/2024. If a stipulation of dismissal or status report letter is not submitted by 11/8/2024, defendants must file an answer by the same date. The telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 10/23/2024 is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/9/2024. (SGC) |
||
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Letter to the Court to report that the parties have reached a settlement in principle by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Levy, Barry) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/07 10:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic status conference will be held on 10/23/2024 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . Parties should come prepared to address the stipulation13 to enjoin collection proceedings. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/7/2024. (SGC) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/03 11:39 AM
ORDER: The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint14 . Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/11/2024. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt. 3. Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 10/11/2024, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 9/3/2024. (SGC) Modified typographical error on 9/3/2024 (SGC) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Request to So-Order Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Eric Akopyan, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe. (Kroopnick, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION Request to So Order Stipulation to Stay and Enjoin Collection Proceedings by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Levy, Barry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Philip P. Nash on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Nash, Philip) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Request to So-Order Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Eric Akopyan, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe. (Rybak, Oleg) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/02 11:30 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/29/2024. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt.3 . Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 8/29/2024, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/2/2024. (SGC) |
||
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/17 11:32 AM
ORDER: The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint10 . Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 7/30/2024. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt.3 . Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 7/30/2024, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 6/17/2024. (SGC) |
||
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Request to So-Order Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kroopnick on behalf of Eric Akopyan, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe (aty to be noticed) (Kroopnick, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Oleg Rybak on behalf of Eric Akopyan, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe (aty to be noticed) (Rybak, Oleg) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Eric Akopyan, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe. (KD) |
|
4 | 4
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/10 6:58 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) |
||
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Eric Akopyan, John Doe Defendants 1 through 10, Eugene Kogan, Lament Supply Group Inc., Papillon Equipment Inc., Dean Ruchir Sardjoe filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17957898 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |