West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Robert C Chambers
Case #: 3:24-cv-00279
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:07 AM EST
Defendant
Kenneth A. Pearson
M.D. St. Mary's Medical Center 2900 First Avenue
Huntington, WV 25702
Represented By
Tammy J. White-Farrell
Farrell & Farrell
contact info
James Benjamin Shepard
Farrell & Farrell
contact info
Defendant
St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc.
a West Virginia corporation, and Melissa Eakle Leasure, Esq. 1340 Hal Greer Boulevard
Huntington, WV 25701
Represented By
Bradley David Dunkle
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Todd A. Biddle
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Robert M. Sellards
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Plaintiff
J. C.
Represented By
L. Dante DiTrapano
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info
David H. Carriger
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info
Timothy D. Houston
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info
Plaintiff
B. C.
Represented By
L. Dante DiTrapano
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info
David H. Carriger
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info
Timothy D. Houston
Calwell Luce Ditrapano
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
79 79 misc Certificate Of Service Fri 05/02 10:39 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. C., J. C. for Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Defendant SMMC. (Houston, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
78 78 order Judge Chambers' Reset Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 10:36 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting the parties'77 JOINT MOTION to Modify the Court's33 Scheduling Order and directing as follows: Discovery requests to be completed by 1/12/2026 and all depositions by 2/11/2026. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/12/2025, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/12/2026, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/28/2026. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/3/2026; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 5/18/2026. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/26/2026. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2026 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/16/2026. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 6/22/2026 in Huntington. Trial set for 6/23/2026 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/1/2025. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
77 77 motion Modify Wed 04/30 11:26 AM
JOINT MOTION by J. C., B. C., St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc., Kenneth A. Pearson to Modify the Court's33 Scheduling Order. (Shepard, James) (Modified on 4/30/2025 to add party filers) (mkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
76 76 misc Certificate Of Service Tue 04/29 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc. for Defendant, St. Marys Medical Center, Inc.s, Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant St. Marys Medical Center, Inc.. (Biddle, Todd)
Related: [-]