Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-03366
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2024 12:53 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Armando Lerma-Ojeda (1)
Terminated: 05/21/2024
Represented By
Enrique R Gonzales
Enrique R Gonzales Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/09/2024 2:11 AM MST
Thursday, May 09, 2024
Arrest of Jose Armando Lerma-Ojeda on 5/9/2024. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Armando Lerma-Ojeda. (CMB)
Related: [-]