Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Kimberly A Jolson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03181
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Case in other court:Belmont County Common Pleaas Court, 24-cv-0128
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
EQT Production Company
Represented By
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Anna G. Rotman
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kenneth A. Young
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
Defendant
Gulfport Energy Corporation
Represented By
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
John C. Ferrell
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rice Drilling D, LLC
Represented By
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Anna G. Rotman
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kenneth A. Young
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
John C. Ferrell
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Senterra Limited
Represented By
Kyle William Rea
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Owen J Rarric
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., Lpa
contact info
Matthew W Onest
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co Lpa
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss. Any allegations in Count IV arising prior to May 16, 2018, and any allegations in Count VI arising prior to May 16, 2020, are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 3/24/2025. (tb)
GPO Apr 07 2025
Stipulated Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/25. (sem)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
41 41 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Fri 04/11 2:21 PM
Scheduling Order: Initial Disclosures due by 4/18/2025. Any motion or stipulation to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties shall be filed by 5/30/ 2025. Discovery due by 12/4/2025. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by 4/10/2025. Dispositive motions due by 1/6/2026. Primary Expert due by 10/1/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/1/2025. Settlement Demand due by 11/14/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/14/2025. Mediation Deadline: January 2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/11/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
40 40 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 04/09 4:06 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Amended Rule 26(f) Report by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 5:27 PM
ORDER issued re33 Rule 26(f) Report in that the parties are ORDERED to file an amended Rule 26(f) report with quicker deadlines within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
38 38 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 1:26 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 12:08 PM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly A. Jolson. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 4/7/2025. (merc)
Related: [-]
36 36 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 11:36 AM
Stipulated Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
35 35 misc Stipulation Fri 04/04 12:59 PM
STIPULATION Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Stipulation Fri 04/04 12:11 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Electronic Discovery Protocol by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 04/04 11:52 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
32 32 order Order Tue 03/25 2:00 PM
NOTATION ORDER: In light of the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (Doc.31 ), the parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26(f) report within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/25/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
31 31 18 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/24 11:05 AM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants'9 Motion to Dismiss. Any allegations in Count IV arising prior to May 16, 2018, and any allegations in Count VI arising prior to May 16, 2020, are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 3/24/2025. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/20 9:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing a Page Compliant Reply Memorandum (Doc.29 ) is GRANTED. Document No. 29-1 shall operate as Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/20/24. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/19 5:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/19/2024. by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Reply in Support
28 28 order Order Thu 09/19 10:40 AM
NOTATION ORDER Defendants'27 Reply is STRICKEN for failure to comply with this Courts standing order limiting reply briefs to 10 pages. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah Daggett Morrison on 9/19/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/18 3:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/04 10:00 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Senterra Limited. (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W Onest for Plaintiff Senterra Limited (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/21 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Owen J Rarric for Plaintiff Senterra Limited SEE DOCKET # 25 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to indicate the correct attorney entering the appearance, and to add said attorney to the docket as counsel (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Tue 08/13 6:22 PM
ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 8/13/2024. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file its response to Defendants9 Motion to Dismiss no later than 9/4/2024. Reply briefs, if any, must be filed no later than 9/18/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/13 6:25 PM
Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responses due by 9/4/2024. Defendants' Replies due by 9/18/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Mon 08/12 3:19 PM
STATUS REPORT | JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES AND JOINT MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Plaintiff Senterra Limited. (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/13 9:54 AM
Joint MOTION to Lift Stay by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC and Plaintiff Senterra Limited SEE DOCKET # 23 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to add the motion portion of the filing to the docket (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/08 4:47 PM
NOTICE by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC Notice of Filing of Complete Copy of Complaint (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Complaint
Thursday, July 11, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/11 1:00 PM
Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/10/2025. (merc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/10 3:43 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE, Motions terminated:17 Joint MOTION to Stay is GRANTED. Theparties are ORDERED to file a joint status report with this Court every six months and upon resolution of, or relief from, the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/10/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/08 1:32 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re9 Motion to Dismiss - Responses due by 7/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/8/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/05 8:50 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation Notice of Stay Order (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/03 11:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/23/2024. by Plaintiff Senterra Limited. (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Mon 07/01 12:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Senterra Limited. (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/25 10:10 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting14 &15 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna Rotman and Kenneth Alan Young as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
15 15 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/24 6:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10034339) of Anna G. Rotman by Defendants EQT Production Company, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
14 14 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/24 6:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10034325) of Kenneth Young by Defendants EQT Production Company, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, June 20, 2024
13 13 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Thu 06/20 10:19 AM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Senterra Limited. (Onest, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
12 12 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Wed 06/19 4:07 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Wed 06/19 4:02 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant EQT Production Company. (West, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Wed 06/19 3:58 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 06/18 4:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Map,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Map,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Map,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Completion Record,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Well Permit,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Completion Record,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Well Permit,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Completion Record,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Well Permit,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Lease
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 2:00 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to submit within TEN DAYS a notice outlining the citizenship of each member of Rice Drilling D, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/12/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wed 06/12 10:33 AM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Anna Rotman and Kenneth Young by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Senterra Limited with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Common Pleas Court of Belmont County on 5/16/2024, Case No. 24cv128 filed by Rice Drilling D, LLC. (mve)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court by Plaintiff Senterra Limited against Defendants EQT Production Company, Gulfport Energy Corporation, and Rice Drilling D, LLC SEE DOCKET # 6 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to correct the filing parties (to reflect that it was filed by plaintiff against all defendants, and not by one defendant against the plaintiff [as was originally docketed by the Clerk]) (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/10 5:53 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation of Bankruptcy Motion to Extend Stay Order (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Motion
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/10 8:00 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant EQT Production Company. (West, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/10 7:58 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/10 7:56 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/10 7:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Belmont County Common Pleas, case number 23-cv-0128 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10012064), filed by Gulfport Energy Corporation, EQT Production Company, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/12 9:56 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent EQT Production Company and Corporate Parent EQT Corporation for Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. SEE DOCKET # 3 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to add the missing corporate parent information for the Defendant (kk2)
Related: [-]
misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/12 9:58 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent EQT Corporation for Defendant EQT Production Company. SEE DOCKET # 4 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to add the missing corporate parent information for the Defendant (kk2)
Related: [-]