Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Robert R Summerhays
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:24-cv-00782
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Case in other court:15th JDC Lafayette parish, c-20242687
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 3:18 AM CST
Defendant
GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By
Sean P Sullivan
Mcglinchey Stafford (no)
contact info
Hannah Stierwald
Mcglinchey Stafford (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Elaine Austin
Represented By
Michael Scott Giardina
Godbey Giardina Law Group
contact info
Devlan Wesley Melancon
Godbey Giardina Law Group
contact info
Dante Cortello
Godbey Giardina Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Thu 05/15 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Craig, C)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order - Hanna/Summerhays/Whitehurst Thu 05/15 8:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 8/3/2026 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2026 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/5/2025. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/9/2025. Rule 26 Report due by 7/3/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/23/2026. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/24/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/23/2026. Discovery deadline 2/23/2026. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2026. Daubert Motions due by 3/24/2026. Motions in Limine due by 6/22/2026. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/22/2026. Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2026. Bench Books due by 7/8/2026. Trial Depositions due by 7/8/2026. Real Time glossary due by 7/15/2026. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 7/15/2026. Signed by Chrissy Craig on 5/15/2025. (crt,Craig, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 2:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 order Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 03/27 12:08 PM
JUDGMENT adopting19 Report and Recommendations re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co,19 Report and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the partial Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and to the extent Plaintiff asserts claims arising from the March 22, 2022 windstorm, such claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 3/27/2025. (crt,Craig, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
19 19 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 03/12 10:27 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court recommends that13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co be GRANTED and, accordingly, to the extent that Plaintiff Elaine Austin's suit asserts claims for covered losses arising from the March 22, 2022 windstorm referenced in her Complaint, further recommends that all such claims be DISMISSED with prejudice as prescribed according to the policy of insurance in effect among the parties on the date of loss and preserving Austin's remaining claims for further proceedings as may be appropriate. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/12/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
18 18 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 08/07 10:40 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Elaine Austin.(aty,Melancon, Devlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vandalism Appraisal Award,
Att: 2 Wind Appraisal Award,
Att: 3 Vandalism Appraisal Estimate,
Att: 4 Wind Appraisal Estimate
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Motion Setting Mon 07/15 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Thu 07/11 2:08 PM
MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION:13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Issued by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 7/11/2024. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 07/10 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/10 7:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, July 01, 2024
12 12 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 4:16 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/25 10:30 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure-2nd NOTICE (Form Included) Tue 06/25 9:12 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re:3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Sean P Sullivan on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/14 11:42 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co answer due 7/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 6/14/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/13 1:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/13/2024.(aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
7 7 order Removal Order Wed 06/12 10:46 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 6/12/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
6 6 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 06/10 11:15 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 06/10 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Devlan Wesley Melancon on behalf of Elaine Austin. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 06/10 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sean P Sullivan on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 06/10 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sean P Sullivan on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/10 10:51 AM
NOTICE of of Compliance by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co (aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/10 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Removal from Lafayette, Case Number 20242687 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5968224) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Sean P Sullivan added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Notice of Compliance,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Mon 06/10 11:00 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/10 11:03 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]