Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:24-bk-15755
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024

Debtor
Ivankovich Family LLC
791 Crandon Blvd Ph 6
Key Biscayne, FL 33149-2202
Represented By
Amanda Klopp
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info
Gary A Goldstein
contact info
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 7:54 AM EDT
Accountant
Andrew Hahm
Mandell Hahm Advisory Group, Ltd. 1033 Skokie Blvd., Suite 330
Northbrook, IL 60062
Creditor
Jeanette Ivankovich
150 West Flagler Street, Suite 200 Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Patricia A Redmond
contact info
Creditor
Schiller DuCanto & Fleck LLP
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Patricia A Redmond
contact info
Interested Party
A&O Family LLC
791 Crandon Blvd Ph 6
Key Biscayne, FL 33139
Represented By
Amanda Klopp
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
A&O Family LLC (Illiniois)
791 Crandon Blvd Ph 6
Key Biscayne, FL 33139
Represented By
Amanda Klopp
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Altas P2 Managing Member LLC
791 Crandon Blvd Ph 6
Key Biscayne, FL 33139
Represented By
Amanda Klopp
Akerman LLP
contact info
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Steven Ivankovich
Meland Budwick, P.A. 200 South Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Michael S Budwick, Esq
contact info
Interested Party
RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By
Ari Newman, Esq.
contact info
Interested Party
Township Capital, LLC
2121 SW 3rd Avenue, Suite 200
Miami, FL 33129
Represented By
Luis Salazar, Esq.
contact info
Interested Party
Township GP Fund II, LP
2121 SW 3rd Avenue, Suite 200
Miami, FL 33129
Represented By
Luis Salazar, Esq.
contact info
Interested Party
Township Orlando, LLC
2121 SW 3rd Avenue, Suite 200
Miami, FL 33129
Represented By
Luis Salazar, Esq.
contact info
Special Counsel
David M Bass
25 Main St
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Special Counsel
Michael D Sirota
25 Main St Court Plaza North
Hackensack, NJ 07601
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Heidi A Feinman
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
Dan L Gold
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
336 336 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 05/01 4:34 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2025 at 11:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 335 Third Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement [Debtors' Third Motion For An Order Extending Its Exclusive Period To Solicit Acceptances Of Their Chapter 11 Plan Thereto Pursuant To Section 1121(d) Of The Bankruptcy Code] Filed by Interested Parties A&O Family LLC, A&O Family LLC (Illiniois), Altas P2 Managing Member LLC, Debtor Ivankovich Family LLC
335 335 motion Extend/Shorten Exclusivity Period Thu 05/01 12:55 PM
Third Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement [Debtors' Third Motion For An Order Extending Its Exclusive Period To Solicit Acceptances Of Their Chapter 11 Plan Thereto Pursuant To Section 1121(d) Of The Bankruptcy Code] Filed by Interested Parties A&O Family LLC, A&O Family LLC (Illiniois), Altas P2 Managing Member LLC, Debtor Ivankovich Family LLC (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
334 334 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sun 04/27 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 332 Re- Notice of Hearing (Re:293 First Interim Application for Compensation of Christenson Law Firm LLP, Special California Counsel for the Debtor Atlas P2 Managing Member LLC for Vonn R. Christenson, Special Counsel, Period: 8/1/2024 to 2/10/2025, Fee: $18,920.00, Expenses: $39.47 Filed by Special Counsel Vonn R. Christenson) Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2025 at 11:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, April 25, 2025
333 333 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 04/25 12:33 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Amanda Klopp Related [+]. (Klopp, Amanda)
Related: [-] 332 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, April 24, 2025
332 332 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK) Thu 04/24 9:05 AM
Re- Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2025 at 11:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 293 First Interim Application for Compensation of Christenson Law Firm LLP, Special California Counsel for the Debtor Atlas P2 Managing Member LLC for Vonn R. Christenson, Special Counsel, Period: 8/1/2024 to 2/10/2025, Fee: $18,920.00, Expenses: $39.47 Filed by Special Counsel Vonn R. Christenson