Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-40745

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kesha L Tanabe
Case #: 4:24-ap-04071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keller Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Keller Mortgage
4725 Lakehurst Court, Suite 400
Dublin, OH 43016
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
8950 Cypress Waters Blvd
Coppell, TX 75019
Plaintiff
Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr.
1595 Selby Avenue, Suite 205
St. Paul, MN 55104
Represented By
Patti J. Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/07 12:21 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr. and Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed order
utility Disposition of adversary Thu 11/07 3:46 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:24-ap-4071. Disposition: DISMISSED. (AVP)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Thu 11/07 3:47 PM
Adversary case 4:24-ap-4071 closed (AVP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
court Public entry Mon 10/28 11:41 AM
HEARING STRICKEN re:14 Notice of Hearing (AVP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
court Notice of returned mail (adversary) Thu 10/17 8:23 AM
You are notified that in the above adversary proceeding, the Related [+], mailed by this office to Keller Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Keller Mortgage has been returned as undeliverable as addressed. Counsel for Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr. (Plaintiff) should add the corrected address to the Courts database by contacting the Calendar Clerk of the assigned Judge and provide the corrected address. (AVP)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Hearing
Friday, October 04, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/04 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
14 14 court Notice of Hearing (Adversary) Wed 10/02 1:51 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2024 at 01:00 PM. Location: Courtroom 2C, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge Kesha L. Tanabe. (AVP)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation12 Order
Sunday, August 11, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/11 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order setting hearing Fri 08/09 8:35 AM
Order Regarding Stipulation and Rescheduling Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/3/2024 at 10:00 AM. Location: Courtroom 2C, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge Kesha L. Tanabe. (AVP)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation,10 Notice of Hearing
Friday, August 02, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Adversary) Fri 08/02 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 court Notice of Hearing (Adversary) Wed 07/31 11:46 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2024 at 10:30 AM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge Kesha L. Tanabe (St Paul). (AVP)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (Adversary) Wed 07/31 11:44 AM
FILED IN ERROR Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2024 at 10:30 AM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge Kesha L. Tanabe (St Paul). (AVP) Modified on 7/31/2024 No Document Attached (KKL)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation or Agreement Tue 07/30 4:45 PM
Stipulation Related [+] filed by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr. and Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: dismissing with prejudice Counts I and II of the Complaint solely as they pertain to the abstract portion of the subject property; cancel the motion hearing set for August 14, 2024 and schedule a review hearing for a date in October 2024; dismissing Keller Mortgage from this action without prejudice; and extension for Nationstar to serve an answer.(Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Case
Thursday, July 11, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 07/11 11:13 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Parent corporation or publicly held corporation reported for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Corporate Parents: Blackrock, Inc.. (Coleman, Samuel)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Motion to Dismiss Case Thu 07/11 11:12 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Memorandum of Facts and Law, Proposed Order, Proof of Service. Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2024 at 10:30 AM. Location: Courtroom 2C, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge Kesha L. Tanabe. (Coleman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of service Fri 06/14 2:00 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr..(Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Monday, June 10, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of service Mon 06/10 4:05 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr..(Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
3 3 misc Certificate of service Mon 06/10 4:04 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr..(Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 06/10 3:04 PM
Summons issued on Keller Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Keller Mortgage Date Issued 6/10/2024, Answer Due 7/10/2024; Nationstar Mortgage LLC Date Issued 6/10/2024, Answer Due 7/10/2024 (AVP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 10:40 AM
Adversary case 24-04071 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Patti J. Sullivan, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Mark Gerard Berken, Jr. against Keller Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Keller Mortgage, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Fee Amount $350.00. (Sullivan, Patti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits