Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Referred: Mark E Ford
Case #: 2:24-cv-02073
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Petitioner
Shaun Jermaine Estes
Respondent
Dexter Payne
Respondent
Hobe Runion

GPO Feb 18 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2025. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 18, 2025. (bjb)
GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full, and the Petition for Habeas Relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 10, 2025. (tmc)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 03/10 8:30 AM
ORDER ADOPTING21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full, and the Petition for Habeas Relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 22541 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 10, 2025. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 03/05 3:37 PM
OBJECTION to21 Report and Recommendations by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 02/18 2:11 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2025. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 18, 2025. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
20 20 misc Reply Fri 01/03 9:02 AM
REPLY by Shaun Jermaine Estes re18 Response to Petition,. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/23 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Shaun Estes. Documents that have previously been returned are being resent including11 Mail Returned, copy of NEF for6 . (tmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
18 18 answer Response to Petition Thu 12/19 1:07 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne.(Bacon, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Criminal Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Terms and Conditions,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Sentencing Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Transcript of Plea Hearing,
Att: 5 Exhibit INDEX
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/07 3:59 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 12/19/2024. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 7, 2024. (bjb)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/07 2:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Bacon, Ashley)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Evangeline Bacon on behalf of Dexter Payne. (Bacon, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 service Service by Clerk - Return Receipt Received (Other) Thu 10/31 11:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,12 Order Directing Service. Tim Griffin received documents on 10/28/2024. (ria)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service by Clerk - Return Receipt Received (Other) Thu 10/31 11:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,12 Order Directing Service. Dexter Payne received documents on 10/29/2024. (ria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order Directing Service Wed 10/23 1:22 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss as to Hobe Runion and DIRECTING the Clerk to substitute DEXTER PAYNE as the Respondent in this case; Further, ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Dexter Payne and the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas and granting 21 days to answer. Petitioners Motion for Summary Judgment6 is DENIED as premature. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 23, 2024. (tmc)
Related: [-]
service Service by Clerk - Certified Mail (Other) Wed 10/23 1:51 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,12 Order, as to Tim Grifffin using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0461 9332 58. (tmc)
Related: [-]
service Service by Clerk - Certified Mail (Other) Wed 10/23 1:52 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,12 Order, as to Dexter Payne using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0461 9332 72. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 10/16 10:31 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender. Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Shaun Jermaine Estes at Sebastian County Detention Center including6 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Resent to ADC - Ouachita River Unit.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 10/04 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Shawn Estes. There are no documents to resend. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 1 pgs service Service by Clerk - Return Receipt Received (Other) Fri 09/27 11:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in5 Order Directing Service,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Sheriff Hobie Runion received documents on 9/23/24.(mll)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Fri 09/27 10:53 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hobe Runion. (Shue, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/27 10:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hobe Runion.Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Shue, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit CERTIFIED SENTENCING ORDER,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit CERTIFIED DOCKET SHEET
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 10:12 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(mll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Directing Service Thu 09/19 1:43 PM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Stephen Tabor and Tim Griffin, Office of the Attorney General and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 19, 2024.(mll)
Related: [-]
service Service by Clerk - Certified Mail (Other) Thu 09/19 2:31 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of5 Order Directing Service,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Hobe Runion, Sheriff of Sebastian County using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0988 5224 54.(mll)
Related: [-]
service Service by Clerk - Certified Mail (Other) Thu 09/19 2:32 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of5 Order Directing Service,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Tim Griffin - Office of Attorney General using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0988 5224 47.(mll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
4 4 motion Entry of Default Tue 09/10 2:23 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Court by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/09 3:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks for all further proceedings. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 9, 2024. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 06/26 9:20 AM
State Habeas Corpus Petition fee received: $ 5, receipt number 2026229. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
2 2 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Mon 06/10 1:16 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 06/10 1:11 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes.(tmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee Mon 06/10 1:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 5.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, by 6/24/2024. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Filing Fee due by 6/24/2024 (tmc)
Related: [-]