Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:24-cv-01488
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:CDC, Orleans Parish, 24-03901 Div. D, Sect. 12
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 3:32 AM CST
Defendant
Benjamin M. Saper
Represented By
Tiffany Ann Mann Collins
Melchiode Marks King
contact info
Eric J. Simonson
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Angela Michelle Hess
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC
Represented By
Eric J. Simonson
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Angela Michelle Hess
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul D. Haaf
Represented By
Kevin P. Riche
Bws Law, LLC
contact info
Barry W Sartin, Jr
Sartin Riche Trial Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/09 12:33 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated within a reasonable time. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/9/2025.(mmv)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order Terminate Hearings Wed 04/09 8:55 AM
ORDER CANCELLING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Prior to the scheduled settlement conference, counsel advised that the case has settled. The U.S. District Judge's chambers have been notified. The settlement conference set for Wednesday, April 9, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/8/2025.(lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines Tue 03/18 3:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the27 Motion is GRANTED. The5 Scheduling Order is hereby AMENDED with respect to the following deadlines as set forth in document. All other deadlines set forth in the5 Scheduling Order (R. Doc. 5) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/18/2025. (mmv)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 03/18 7:34 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Plaintiff and . **1) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. **2) Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).**(mmv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Deadlines Mon 03/17 4:55 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC, Benjamin M. Saper.(Simonson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 trial Witness and Exhibit List Fri 02/14 3:52 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Simonson, Eric)
Related: [-]
25 25 trial Witness and Exhibit List Fri 02/14 2:53 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Riche, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 4 pgs order Order Set Hearings Tue 01/28 4:59 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby scheduled for Wednesday, April 9, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. The required settlement memoranda, more fully described on Pages 2-3, are due no later than 11:59 p.m. on Wednesday, April 2, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 1/28/2025.(lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 01/22 1:02 PM
ORDER granting21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines as set forth in document. All discovery must be completed by 3/24/2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/22/2025.(mmm)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 01/22 8:28 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines . **1) Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). **2) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. **3) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.**(mmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Deadlines Tue 01/21 11:35 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Benjamin M. Saper, Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC.(Simonson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/23 10:29 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement/Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement . (Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/23/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 10:23 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC. Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/23/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 10/04 9:55 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Benjamin M. Saper.(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/4/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 09/27 8:44 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Eric J. Simonson (La. Bar No. 21876) and Angela M. Hess (La. Bar No. 39908), of the law firm of Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP, shall be enrolled as counsel of record for defendant, Benjamin Saper. Attorney Tiffany Ann Mann Collins terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/27/24. (fml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 09/26 4:13 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric J. Simonson LA Bar Roll 21876 and Angela M. Hess LA Bar Roll 39908 to be substituted in place of Tiffany A. Mann Collins and the law firm Melchiode Marks King, LLC by Benjamin M. Saper. Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Benjamin M. Saper(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 9/26/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 09/25 9:58 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric J. Simonson and Angela M. Hess to be substituted in place of Tiffany A. Mann Collins and the law firm Melchiode Marks King, LLC by Benjamin M. Saper.Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Benjamin M. Saper(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 9:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC. (mmv)
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/23 9:44 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Benjamin M. Saper, Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC filed by Paul D. Haaf.(mmv)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 09/23 9:23 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING as unopposed11 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint (R. Doc. 11-1) into the record in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/23/24. (fml)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/20 12:59 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Paul D. Haaf.(Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading- Amd Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 09/18 9:33 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the9 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to re-file the Motion with a proposed comprehensive amended pleading that includes all of Plaintiff's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of the parties, which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/18/2024. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Tue 09/17 3:11 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Paul D. Haaf.(Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/17/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading- Amd Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/13 12:27 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Paul D. Haaf . (Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/13/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 minutes Status Conference Mon 09/09 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/9/2024. During the conference, the Court discussed with counsel the status of the case. The deadlines set forth in the Court's5 Scheduling Order remain in effect. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/27 3:23 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Benjamin M. Saper . (Collins, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/27/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 2:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER as set forth in document: Jury Trial set for 5/19/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/9/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 3/3/2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/20/2024.(mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice Form
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 08/20 9:08 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Benjamin M. Saper.(Collins, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 07/31 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A call-in scheduling conference is set for 8/20/2024 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 06/10 2:10 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (meb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/10 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CDC, Orleans Parish, case number 2024-03901 Div. D, Sect. 12 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10561409) filed by Benjamin M. Sapwer.Attorney Tiffany Ann Mann Collins added to party Benjamin M. Sapwer(pty:dft).(Collins, Tiffany) Modified text on 6/10/2024 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 State Court Pleadings and Notice of Compliance pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b),
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of State Court Petition via Long Arm Statute