Haaf v. Saper
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy B Vitter |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01488 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Case in other court: | CDC, Orleans Parish, 24-03901 Div. D, Sect. 12 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 3:32 AM CST |
Defendant
Benjamin M. Saper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul D. Haaf
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated within a reasonable time. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/9/2025.(mmv) |
|
30 | 30
![]() ORDER CANCELLING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Prior to the scheduled settlement conference, counsel advised that the case has settled. The U.S. District Judge's chambers have been notified. The settlement conference set for Wednesday, April 9, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/8/2025.(lb) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the27 Motion is GRANTED. The5 Scheduling Order is hereby AMENDED with respect to the following deadlines as set forth in document. All other deadlines set forth in the5 Scheduling Order (R. Doc. 5) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/18/2025. (mmv) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 03/18 7:34 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Plaintiff and . **1) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. **2) Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).**(mmv) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC, Benjamin M. Saper.(Simonson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Simonson, Eric) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Witness and Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Riche, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby scheduled for Wednesday, April 9, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. The required settlement memoranda, more fully described on Pages 2-3, are due no later than 11:59 p.m. on Wednesday, April 2, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 1/28/2025.(lb) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines as set forth in document. All discovery must be completed by 3/24/2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/22/2025.(mmm) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 01/22 8:28 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines . **1) Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). **2) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. **3) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.**(mmv) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Benjamin M. Saper, Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC.(Simonson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement/Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement . (Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/23/2024 (mmv) |
|
19 | 19
![]() ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC. Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/23/2024 (mmv) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Benjamin M. Saper.(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 10/4/2024 (mmv) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/27 8:44 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Eric J. Simonson (La. Bar No. 21876) and Angela M. Hess (La. Bar No. 39908), of the law firm of Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP, shall be enrolled as counsel of record for defendant, Benjamin Saper. Attorney Tiffany Ann Mann Collins terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/27/24. (fml) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric J. Simonson LA Bar Roll 21876 and Angela M. Hess LA Bar Roll 39908 to be substituted in place of Tiffany A. Mann Collins and the law firm Melchiode Marks King, LLC by Benjamin M. Saper. Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Benjamin M. Saper(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) Modified text on 9/26/2024 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric J. Simonson and Angela M. Hess to be substituted in place of Tiffany A. Mann Collins and the law firm Melchiode Marks King, LLC by Benjamin M. Saper.Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party Benjamin M. Saper(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Summons Issued as to Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC. (mmv) |
|
13 | 13
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Benjamin M. Saper, Rare Space Hospitality Group LLC filed by Paul D. Haaf.(mmv) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 09/23 9:23 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING as unopposed11 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Complaint (R. Doc. 11-1) into the record in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/23/24. (fml) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Paul D. Haaf.(Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the9 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to re-file the Motion with a proposed comprehensive amended pleading that includes all of Plaintiff's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of the parties, which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/18/2024. (mmv) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Paul D. Haaf.(Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/17/2024 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Paul D. Haaf . (Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 9/13/2024 (mmv) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/9/2024. During the conference, the Court discussed with counsel the status of the case. The deadlines set forth in the Court's5 Scheduling Order remain in effect. (mmv) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Benjamin M. Saper . (Collins, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/27/2024 (mmv) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER as set forth in document: Jury Trial set for 5/19/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/9/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 3/3/2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/20/2024.(mmv) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Benjamin M. Saper.(Collins, Tiffany) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A call-in scheduling conference is set for 8/20/2024 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 06/10 2:10 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CDC, Orleans Parish, case number 2024-03901 Div. D, Sect. 12 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10561409) filed by Benjamin M. Sapwer.Attorney Tiffany Ann Mann Collins added to party Benjamin M. Sapwer(pty:dft).(Collins, Tiffany) Modified text on 6/10/2024 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |