Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-22231
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:20 AM EST
Defendant
Edward R. Cochrane, Jr.
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff
Thaddius T. Dorsey


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/20 11:52 AM
ORDER Dismissing1 Complaint without prejudice; denying as moot3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/20 11:53 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/10 4:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dorsey Thaddius T.. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 06/10 4:49 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Navy Federal Credit Union, Edward R. Cochrane, Jr. Filing fees $405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Dorsey Thaddius T..(jas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons