Seebeck v. Rentgrow Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kymberly K Evanson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00818 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 1:53 AM PST |
Defendant
Rentgrow Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Don Seebeck, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Larry Don Seebeck, Jr (McCraw, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED and any pending motion is hereby STRICKEN. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Larry Don Seebeck, Jr (McCraw, Dawn) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/5/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/19/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2024. (DS) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/09 4:37 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam E Lang for DEFENDANT Rentgrow Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/09 4:32 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erica J Stutman for DEFENDANT Rentgrow Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Tue 07/09 3:55 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice9 by attorney Erica J. Stutman will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG) |
||
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice10 by attorney Adam E. Lang will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam E. Lang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rentgrow Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8535139 (Applegate, Brett) |
|
9 | 9
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica J. Stutman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rentgrow Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8535135 (Applegate, Brett) |
|
8 | 8
![]() MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/03 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, . Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to July 26, 2024. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (LL) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Rentgrow Inc. Noting Date 7/1/2024, (Applegate, Brett) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/8/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brett Applegate on behalf of Defendant Rentgrow Inc. (Applegate, Brett) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Rentgrow Inc on 6/14/2024 (McCraw, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Rentgrow Inc. (RE) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/12 11:05 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (RE) |
||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Rentgrow, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Attorney Dawn M McCraw added to party Larry Don Seebeck, Jr(pty:pla) filed by Larry Don Seebeck, Jr.(McCraw, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |