Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00818
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 1:53 AM PST
Defendant
Rentgrow Inc
Represented By
Adam E Lang
Snell & Wilmer (az)
contact info
Erica J Stutman
Snell & Wilmer (az)
contact info
Brett Applegate
Snell & Wilmer Llp (or)
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Don Seebeck, Jr
Represented By
Dawn M McCraw
Consumer Attorneys Plc (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Thu 08/29 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Larry Don Seebeck, Jr (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 order KKE Order Dismissing Case (Form) Wed 07/24 12:51 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED and any pending motion is hereby STRICKEN. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/24 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Larry Don Seebeck, Jr (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
14 14 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 07/15 1:30 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/5/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/19/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
13 13 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Mon 07/15 1:28 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/09 4:37 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam E Lang for DEFENDANT Rentgrow Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/09 4:32 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erica J Stutman for DEFENDANT Rentgrow Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Tue 07/09 3:55 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice9 by attorney Erica J. Stutman will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice10 by attorney Adam E. Lang will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/08 1:08 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam E. Lang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rentgrow Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8535139 (Applegate, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/08 1:06 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica J. Stutman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rentgrow Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8535135 (Applegate, Brett)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 07/08 11:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/03 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, . Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to July 26, 2024. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (LL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 07/01 1:28 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Rentgrow Inc. Noting Date 7/1/2024, (Applegate, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent Letter & Form Mon 07/01 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/8/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brett Applegate on behalf of Defendant Rentgrow Inc. (Applegate, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/14 10:12 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Rentgrow Inc on 6/14/2024 (McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/12 11:20 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Rentgrow Inc. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/12 11:05 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Rentgrow, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Dawn M McCraw added to party Larry Don Seebeck, Jr(pty:pla) filed by Larry Don Seebeck, Jr.(McCraw, Dawn)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8500376
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons