California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:24-cv-03468
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 1:14 AM PST
Defendant
Armon Dadgar
Defendant
Todd Ford
Defendant
HashiCorp, Inc.
Defendant
David Henshall
Defendant
Dave McJannet
Defendant
Glenn Solomon
Defendant
Susan St. Ledger
Defendant
Sigal Zarmi
Plaintiff
Michelle Graff
Represented By
Evan Jason Smith
Brodsky Smith
contact info
Ryan P. Cardona
Brodsky & Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/12 7:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Graff (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/13 10:03 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 06/11 4:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Armon Dadgar, Todd Ford, HashiCorp, Inc., David Henshall, Dave McJannet, Glenn Solomon, Susan St. Ledger, Sigal Zarmi. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 06/11 4:42 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 06/10 1:54 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/10 11:23 AM
Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 06/10 11:22 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Michelle Graff (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 06/10 11:21 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michelle Graff (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Armon Dadgar, Todd Ford, HashiCorp, Inc., David Henshall, Dave McJannet, Glenn Solomon, Susan St. Ledger, Sigal Zarmi ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19502364.). Filed by Michelle Graff.(Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet