California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-04881
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 1:21 AM PST
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Evan Schlafer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Daniel C Posner
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
X Corp.
Represented By
Scott Evan Schlafer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Daniel C Posner
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NY Black and Gold Corporation
Represented By
Taylor C Foss
One LLP
contact info
Victoria Elizabeth Mulvey
One LLP
contact info
Peter R. Afrasiabi
One LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Waterman
Represented By
Taylor C Foss
One LLP
contact info
Victoria Elizabeth Mulvey
One LLP
contact info
Peter R. Afrasiabi
One LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
44 44 order Substitute Attorney Fri 05/23 6:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Kenneth M Trujillo-Jamison for Defendant X Corp., in place and stead of Attorneys Daniel C Posner, Scott Schlafer43 . (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2025
43 43 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Thu 05/22 3:30 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison in place of attorney Daniel C. Posner; Scott Schlafer filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc., X Corp.. (Attorney Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison added to party Twitter, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison added to party X Corp.(pty:dft)) (Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney
Friday, April 25, 2025
42 42 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 04/25 1:31 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. (mku)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 04/25 1:02 PM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo: The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 3/3/2026 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 2/12/2026 at 8:30 AM. Fact Discovery Cut-Off: 6/18/2025. Last Date to Hear Motions: 10/9/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 12/4/2025. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 1/15/2026. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 1/29/2026. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
40 40 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/24 3:54 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Serena R. Murillo. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
39 39 misc Statement Tue 03/18 1:08 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation re: Order38 . (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
38 38 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 12:11 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Thu 02/27 2:24 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-048) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Serena R. Murillo, this case is transferred from Judge Anne Hwang to the calendar of Judge Serena R. Murillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04881 SRM(PDx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/04 3:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint35 by Judge Anne Hwang, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint serves as its Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (jp)
Related: [-]
35 35 4 pgs stip Order Tue 02/04 8:55 AM
STIPULATION for Order that Defendant's Answer Applies to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant X Corp..(Schlafer, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
34 34 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 01/21 4:38 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
33 33 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 01/21 4:37 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, Twitter, Inc., X Corp. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/21 11:55 AM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint and Extending Pretrial and Trial Dates31 by Judge Anne Hwang, The pretrial and trial dates set in the Scheduling Order (Dkt. No.25 ) and Civil Trial Order (Dkt. No.26 ) are hereby extended/continued, as indicated in the below chart: Fact Discovery cut-off: 6/18/2025. Expert disclosure (initial): 7/2/2025. Fact discovery cut-off: 7/2/2025. Expert disclosure (initial): 7/30/2025. Expert discovery cut-off: 8/21/2025. 9/24/2025. Mediation completion deadline: 10/17/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2025 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2026 at 08:30 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
31 31 stip Leave Fri 01/17 12:15 PM
STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and for Extension of Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation.(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Taylor C. Foss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Redline Version of Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Clean Version of Proposed Second Amended Complaint with Exhibits,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
30 30 17 pgs order Order Wed 12/18 12:13 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
29 29 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 12/09 6:35 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-199) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Anne Hwang, this case is transferred from Judge Hernan D. Vera to the calendar of Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04881 AH(PDx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
28 28 order Protective Order Mon 11/25 5:22 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER27 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
27 27 stip Protective Order Fri 11/22 5:11 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation.(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
Friday, November 15, 2024
26 26 18 pgs order Order Fri 11/15 9:11 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/14 7:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Having considered the parties' proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 07/31/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2025 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 8/26/2025 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for other deadlines. (lom)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2024
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Sun 11/10 9:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: The Court takes off-calendar the Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/24 and takes it under submission. Separate order with dates to follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 10/29 2:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation..(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Thursday, August 22, 2024
22 22 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/26 10:25 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Hearing Date: 11/12/2024, Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. by Judge Hernan D. Vera: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Hernn D. Vera. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on the above date in Courtroom 5B of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/09 8:14 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant X Corp., identifying X Holdings Corp.. (Schlafer, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 08/08 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to First Amended Complaint19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,12 JURY DEMAND. Answer filed by Defendant X Corp..(Schlafer, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 07/08 1:27 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Twitter, Inc. answer now due 8/8/2024, filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc..(Attorney Scott Evan Schlafer added to party Twitter, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schlafer, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 06/21 12:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Waterman, upon Defendant X Corp. served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Ana Gomes - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
16 16 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 11:13 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint12 as to Defendant X Corp. a Nevada corporation. (lom)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 11:11 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint12 as to Defendant Twitter, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
14 14 notice Summons Request Fri 06/14 3:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,12 filed by Plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Summons Request Fri 06/14 3:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,12 filed by Plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
12 12 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 06/14 3:14 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, Twitter, Inc., X Corp. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/12 5:03 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (gga)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/12 1:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Twitter, Inc., X Corp. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 XCorp
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 06/11 10:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 06/11 10:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/11 10:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
6 6 notice Summons Request Mon 06/10 3:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Mon 06/10 3:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 06/10 3:10 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 06/10 3:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman, (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 06/10 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs NY Black and Gold Corporation, Elizabeth Waterman. (Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/10 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37625325 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Waterman, NY Black and Gold Corporation. (Attorney Taylor C Foss added to party NY Black and Gold Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Taylor C Foss added to party Elizabeth Waterman(pty:pla))(Foss, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C