New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-04450
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
Madame Tussauds New York, LLC
Represented By
Colleen Gulliver
Dla Piper Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Colleen Gulliver
Dla Piper Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Hernandez
Represented By
Kate Marietta McGuire
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz
contact info
Matthew Moylan Guiney
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Thu 10/31 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Wendy Hernandez hereby voluntarily dismisses her individual claims in the above-captioned action (the "Action") with prejudice. Because this notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiff's dismissal of the Action is effective upon filing of this notice. The parties will each bear their own fees and costs. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal pertains only to the Plaintiff's individual claims and not any claims asserted on behalf of a putative class. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/31/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/31 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Madame Tussauds New York, LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/10 2:42 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Merlin US Holdings Limited for Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/10 2:28 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. for Madame Tussauds New York, LLC. Document filed by Madame Tussauds New York, LLC..(Gulliver, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 10/09 11:19 AM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, October 18, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. is ADJOURNED to Friday, November 8, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. The deadline for the parties to submit a joint proposed case management plan and joint letter containing the information described on page 2 of the Court's June 11, 2024, Order, see Dkt. 5, is extended from Thursday, October 10, 2024, to Thursday, October 31, 2024. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from Friday, October 18, 2024, to Friday, November 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/9/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 10/09 11:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Madame Tussauds New York, LLC answer due 11/8/2024; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. answer due 11/8/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/08 8:03 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated October 8, 2024. Document filed by Madame Tussauds New York, LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 08/08 12:57 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, August 16, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. is ADJOURNED to Friday, October 18, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. The deadline for the parties to submit a joint proposed case management plan and joint letter containing the information described on page 2 of the Court's June 11, 2024, Order, see Dkt. 5, is extended from Thursday, August 8, 2024, to Thursday, October 10, 2024. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from Monday, August 26, 2024, to Friday, October 18, 2024. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/8/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/08 12:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Madame Tussauds New York, LLC answer due 10/18/2024; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. answer due 10/18/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen Gulliver on behalf of Madame Tussauds New York, LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 08/07 5:14 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference - adjourn IPTC which is currently scheduled Aug. 16, 2024 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew M. Guiney dated Aug. 7, 2024. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/11 1:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Madame Tussauds New York, LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/11 12:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate Marietta McGuire on behalf of Wendy Hernandez..(McGuire, Kate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 06/12 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madame Tussauds New York, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 06/12 11:45 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 06/11 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/11/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 06/11 3:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madame Tussauds New York, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 06/11 3:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 06/11 10:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 06/11 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 06/11 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/10 6:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 6:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Madame Tussauds New York, LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29467996)Document filed by Wendy Hernandez..(Guiney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A